This case was last updated from PACER on 09/11/2021 at 09:37:42 (UTC).

Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada et al v. Matrix Air Balance Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Matrix Air Balance Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christina A. Snyder and Gail J. Standish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05649

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christina A. Snyder

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada

Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada

Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee

Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund

Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Workers 401A Plan

International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 105 Union Dues Check-Off and Deferred Savings Fund

Board of Trustees of Southern California Labor Management Cooperation Trust

Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern California

Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Health Reimbursement Plan

Defendants

Matrix Air Balance Inc

Steven Koll Brockman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Laurie A Traktman

Attorney at Gilbert and Sackman ALC

3699 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90010-2732

Steven M Rehaut

Attorney at Gilbert and Sackman ALC

3699 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Benjamin M O'Donnell

Attorney at Gilbert and Sackman ALC

3699 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 105 Union Dues Check-Off and Deferred Savings Fund, Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Board of Trustees of Southern California Labor Management Cooperation Trust, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Health Reimbursement Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern California, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Workers 401A Plan, upon Defendant Matrix Air Balance Inc served on 7/19/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Steven Koll Brockman - Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Traktman, Laurie) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 105 Union Dues Check-Off and Deferred Savings Fund, Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Board of Trustees of Southern California Labor Management Cooperation Trust, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Health Reimbursement Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern California, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Workers 401A Plan, upon Defendant Steven Koll Brockman served on 7/19/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Traktman, Laurie) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

#8

(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Steven Koll Brockman, Matrix Air Balance Inc. (lh) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71),,, #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Health Reimbursement Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of Southern California Labor Management Cooperation Trust, Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Workers 401(a) Plan, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern California, International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 105 Union Dues Check-Off and Deferred Savings Fund. (Traktman, Laurie) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#3

(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Traktman, Laurie) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Health Reimbursement Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of Southern California Labor Management Cooperation Trust, Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Workers 401(a) Plan, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern California, International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 105 Union Dues Check-Off and Deferred Savings Fund. (Traktman, Laurie) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31619089 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 105 Union Dues Check-Off and Deferred Savings Fund, Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Board of Trustees of Southern California Labor Management Cooperation Trust, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Health Reimbursement Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern California, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Workers 401(a) Plan. (Attorney Laurie A Traktman added to party Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada(pty:pla), Attorney Laurie A Traktman added to party Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Health Reimbursement Plan(pty:pla), Attorney Laurie A Traktman added to party Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Laurie A Traktman added to party Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada(pty:pla), Attorney Laurie A Traktman added to party Board of Trustees of Southern California Labor Management Cooperation Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Laurie A Traktman added to party Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee(pty:pla), Attorney Laurie A Traktman added to party Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Workers 401(a) Plan(pty:pla), Attorney Laurie A Traktman added to party Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern California(pty:pla), Attorney Laurie A Traktman added to party International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 105 Union Dues Check-Off and Deferred Savings Fund(pty:pla))(Traktman, Laurie) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 105 Union Dues Check-Off and Deferred Savings Fund, Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Board of Trustees of Southern California Labor Management Cooperation Trust, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Health Reimbursement Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern California, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Workers 401A Plan, upon Defendant Matrix Air Balance Inc served on 7/19/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Steven Koll Brockman - Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Traktman, Laurie) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 105 Union Dues Check-Off and Deferred Savings Fund, Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Board of Trustees of Southern California Labor Management Cooperation Trust, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Health Reimbursement Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern California, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Workers 401A Plan, upon Defendant Steven Koll Brockman served on 7/19/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Traktman, Laurie) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Steven Koll Brockman, Matrix Air Balance Inc. (lh) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (lh) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71),,, #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Health Reimbursement Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of Southern California Labor Management Cooperation Trust, Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Workers 401(a) Plan, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern California, International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 105 Union Dues Check-Off and Deferred Savings Fund. (Traktman, Laurie) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Traktman, Laurie) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Health Reimbursement Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of Southern California Labor Management Cooperation Trust, Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Workers 401(a) Plan, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern California, International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 105 Union Dues Check-Off and Deferred Savings Fund. (Traktman, Laurie) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31619089 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 105 Union Dues Check-Off and Deferred Savings Fund, Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee, Board of Trustees of Southern California Labor Management Cooperation Trust, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Health Reimbursement Plan, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern California, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund, Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada, Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Workers 401(a) Plan. (Attorney Laurie A Traktman added to party Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Health Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada(pty:pla), Attorney Laurie A Traktman added to party Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Health Reimbursement Plan(pty:pla), Attorney Laurie A Traktman added to party Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Local 105 Retirees Supplemental Health Care Trust Fund(pty:pla), Attorney Laurie A Traktman added to party Board of Trustees of Sheet Metal Workers Pension Plan of Southern California, Arizona and Nevada(pty:pla), Attorney Laurie A Traktman added to party Board of Trustees of Southern California Labor Management Cooperation Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Laurie A Traktman added to party Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Joint Apprenticeship and Training Committee(pty:pla), Attorney Laurie A Traktman added to party Board of Trustees of Southern California Sheet Metal Workers 401(a) Plan(pty:pla), Attorney Laurie A Traktman added to party Board of Trustees of the Sheet Metal and Air Conditioning Contractors National Association of Southern California(pty:pla), Attorney Laurie A Traktman added to party International Association of Sheet Metal Air, Rail and Transportation Workers, Local Union No. 105 Union Dues Check-Off and Deferred Savings Fund(pty:pla))(Traktman, Laurie) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers' Local 359 is a litigant

Latest cases where Board of Trustees of the Southern California Sheet Metal Industry Labor Management Cooperation Trust is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laurie A Traktman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Michael O'Donnell