This case was last updated from PACER on 03/08/2020 at 08:11:23 (UTC).

Board of Directors, Watergate Villas East Condominum Association v. CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 Board of Directors, Watergate Villas East Condominum Association filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO EX-11-PR17-3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ruth Miller and Curtis V. Gomez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00003

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virgin Islands District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ruth Miller

Presiding Judge

Curtis V. Gomez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Board of Directors, Watergate Villas East Condominum Association

Defendant

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J. Daryl Dodson

Attorney at Moore, Dodson and Russell

Suite 310

St Thomas, VI 00802

Defendant Attorney

Eric Hiller

Attorney at Clyde & Co US LLP

1221 Brickell Ave, Ste 1600

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

10 #2

Exhibit B

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Commencement of Proceeding by Board of Directors, Watergate Villas East Condominum Association re #5 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Dodson, J. Daryl) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Filing Corrected Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3 re #8 Reply to, in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings (Hiller, Eric) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

#7

(#7) REPLY to re #6 Response filed by Plaintiff Board of Directors, Watergate Villas East Condominum Association to Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings filed by Defendant CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3. Responses due by 2/25/2020 (Hiller, Eric) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Stipulation by Board of Directors, Watergate Villas East Condominum Association (Dodson, J. Daryl) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER (RM) granting #3 Motion for refund of a duplicate filing fee. (AO) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Defendant CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hiller, Eric) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Defendant CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3. (Hiller, Eric) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3 from Superior Court of Virgin Islands, Division of St. Thomas, case number STT-19-647. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AVIDC-830207)filed by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hiller, Eric) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Commencement of Proceeding by Board of Directors, Watergate Villas East Condominum Association re #5 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Dodson, J. Daryl) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Filing Corrected Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3 re #8 Reply to, in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings (Hiller, Eric) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPLY to re #6 Response filed by Plaintiff Board of Directors, Watergate Villas East Condominum Association in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings (Corrected) filed by Defendant CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3. Responses due by 2/26/2020 (Hiller, Eric) (Entered: 02/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPLY to re #6 Response filed by Plaintiff Board of Directors, Watergate Villas East Condominum Association to Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Proceedings filed by Defendant CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3. Responses due by 2/25/2020 (Hiller, Eric) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Response re #2 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Plaintiff Board of Directors, Watergate Villas East Condominum Association. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dodson, J. Daryl) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY Event and Pdf do not match Re: #5 Notice (Other). (KAB) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Stipulation by Board of Directors, Watergate Villas East Condominum Association (Dodson, J. Daryl) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER (RM) granting #3 Motion for refund of a duplicate filing fee. (AO) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Defendant CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Hiller, Eric) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Defendant CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3. (Hiller, Eric) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3 from Superior Court of Virgin Islands, Division of St. Thomas, case number STT-19-647. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AVIDC-830207)filed by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE NO. EX-11-PR17-3. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hiller, Eric) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less