This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2022 at 07:37:02 (UTC).

Board of County Commissioners of the County of Torrance v. Allergan PLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/28/2022 Board of County Commissioners of the County of Torrance filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Allergan PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-OP-45004

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Board of County Commissioners of the County of Torrance

Defendants

Allergan PLC

Allergan Finance LLC

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.

Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.

Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.

Eckerd Corporation

Walmart Inc.

Actavis plc

Actavis Inc

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Allergan Sales LLC

Allergan U.S.A., Inc.

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Warner Chilcott Company, LLC

Watson Pharma, Inc.

Actavis South Athlantic LLC

Actavis Elizabeth LLC

Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC

47 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin R. Kaufman

Attorney at Kelly Durham & Pittard

505 Cerrillos Road

Santa Fe, NM 87501

Other Attorneys

Francis A. Citera

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig - Chicago

77 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Gretchen N. Miller

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig - Chicago

77 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-212) by JPML (certified copy) transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407; assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster (MDL 2804). (bl) [Transferred from nmd on 1/28/2022.] (Entered: 01/28/2022)

4 #4

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

4 #1

*Restricted*

#151

(#8) Order Master Stipulation & Order Dismissing With Prejudice Plaintiff Subdivisions' Claims Against Settling Distributor and Janssen Defendants. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/14/2022. (H,SN) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#5

(#5) Attorney Appearance by Francis A. Citera filed by on behalf of Albertson's LLC. (Citera, Francis) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Albertson's LLC. (Citera, Francis) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#7

(#7) Attorney Appearance by Gretchen N. Miller filed by on behalf of Albertson's LLC. (Miller, Gretchen) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order Master Stipulation & Order Dismissing With Prejudice Plaintiff Subdivisions' Claims Against Settling Distributor and Janssen Defendants. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/14/2022. (H,SN) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Attorney Appearance by Gretchen N. Miller filed by on behalf of Albertson's LLC. (Miller, Gretchen) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Albertson's LLC. (Citera, Francis) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Attorney Appearance by Francis A. Citera filed by on behalf of Albertson's LLC. (Citera, Francis) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Mexico. Case number 1:21-cv-01229. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-212) by JPML (certified copy) transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407; assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster (MDL 2804). (bl) [Transferred from nmd on 1/28/2022.] (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) [Transferred from nmd on 1/28/2022.] (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (jg) [Transferred from nmd on 1/28/2022.] (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-8053945 re #1 Complaint filed by Board of County Commissioners of the County of Torrance (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kaufman, Justin) [Transferred from nmd on 1/28/2022.] (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Board of County Commissioners of the County of Torrance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaufman, Justin) [Transferred from nmd on 1/28/2022.] (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC (DE) is a litigant

Latest cases where Eckerd Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where WATSON PHARMA INC. is a litigant