This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/20/2021 at 10:42:31 (UTC).

Board of County Commissioners of the County of Colfax v. Allergan Finance LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 Board of County Commissioners of the County of Colfax filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Allergan Finance LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-OP-45055

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Defendants

Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.

Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.

Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.

Allergan PLC

Allergan Finance LLC

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Walmart Inc.

WSE Management LLC

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.

Actavis Kadian LLC

CVS RX Services, Inc.

Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

McKesson Corporation

Actavis Totowa LLC

Actavis Elizabeth LLC

Rite Aid of Ohio, Inc.

West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Cardinal Health Inc.

46 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Rosalind Bienvenu

Attorney at Kelly Durham & Pittard

505 Cerrillos Road

Santa Fe, NM 87501

Caren I Friedman

505 Cerrillos Rd. Suite A209

Santa Fe, NM 87501

Justin R. Kaufman

Attorney at Kelly Durham & Pittard

505 Cerrillos Road

Santa Fe, NM 87501

Thomas E. Rice, Jr.

Attorney at Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice - Kansas City

2400 E. Pershing Road

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

#3

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by KVK Tech, Inc.. (Rice, Thomas) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Attorney Appearance by Thomas E. Rice, Jr filed by on behalf of KVK Tech, Inc.. (Rice, Thomas) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of New Mexico. Case number 1:21-cv-00260. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-191) by JPML (certified copy) transferring this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407; assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster (MDL 2804). (bl) [Transferred from nmd on 4/21/2021.] (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp) [Transferred from nmd on 4/21/2021.] (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (arp) [Transferred from nmd on 4/21/2021.] (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7607382 re #1 Complaint filed by Board of County Commissioners of the County of Colfax (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Kaufman, Justin) [Transferred from nmd on 4/21/2021.] (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Board of County Commissioners of the County of Colfax. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaufman, Justin) [Transferred from nmd on 4/21/2021.] (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WSE MANAGEMENT, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS RX SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where RITE AID CORP. is a litigant