This case was last updated from PACER on 04/10/2020 at 08:13:47 (UTC).

Board of County Commissioners of Logan County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2020 Board of County Commissioners of Logan County filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Purdue Pharma LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-OP-45058

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Defendants

Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

MD William Valuck

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Mallinckrodt LLC

Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Mallinckrodt PLC

Insys Therapeutics, Inc.

Purdue Frederick Company, The

Physicians Total Care Inc

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.

Actavis plc

Keysource Medical, Inc.

Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Actavis LLC

Allergan PLC

Harvard Drug Group LLC The

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

G. Calvin Sharpe

Attorney at Phillips Murrah

101 N Robinson, Suite 1300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

John H. Sparks

Attorney at Odom Sparks & Jones

140 Hipoint Office Bldg., 2500 S. Mcgee Drive

Norman, OK 73072

Michael W. Ridgeway

Attorney at Odom Sparks & Jones

140 Hipoint Office Bldg., 2500 S. Mcgee Drive

Norman, OK 73072

Joshua D. Burns

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy

Braniff Building, Ste. 100, 324 N. Robinson Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Ashley E Quinn

Attorney at Gable & Gotwals

15Th Floor, 211 N. Robinson Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Kyle D. Evans

Attorney at GableGotwals

15Th Floor, 211 N. Robinson Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Amy Jo Pierce

Attorney at Corbyn Hampton Barghols Pierce

211 North Robinson Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Joe Michael Hampton

Attorney at Corbyn Hampton Barghols Pierce

211 North Robinson Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Nicholas V. Merkley

Attorney at Gable & Gotwals

15Th Floor, 211 N. Robinson Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Robert G. McCampbell

Attorney at Gable & Gotwals

15Th Floor, 211 N. Robinson Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Stuart D. Campbell

Attorney at Doerner Saunders Daniel & Anderson

Two W. Second Street

Tulsa, OK 74103

Ryan A. Ray

Attorney at Norman Wohlgemuth Chandler & Jeter

401 S. Boston

Tulsa, OK 74103

Other Attorneys

Todd A. Court

Attorney at McAfee & Taft - Oklahoma City

10Th Floor, Two Leadership Square, 211 North Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Robert A. Bragalone

Attorney at Gordon & Rees - Dallas

2100 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Matthew J. Sill

Attorney at Fulmer Sill Law Group

1101 North Broadway Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

Tony G. Puckett

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

10Th Floor, Two Leadership Square, 211 N Robinson Ave.

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7103

D. Michael McBride, III

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy

321 S. Boston

Tulsa, OK 74103

Harrison C. Lujan

Attorney at Fulmer Sill Law Group

1101 North Broadway Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

Susan E. Huntsman

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy -Tulsa

500 Kennedy Bldg., 321 South Boston Avenue

Tulsa, OK 74103

D. Todd Riddles

Attorney at Cheek Law Firm

311 N. Harvey Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#52

(#52) Joint Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) as to Perry Fine, M.D. and Lynn Webster, M.D. filed by Board of County Commissioners of Logan County. (Puckett, Tony) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

51 #1

*Restricted*

#51

(#51) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Western. Case number 5:19-cv-00984. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#50

(#50) TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Northern Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (ank) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#49

(#49) NOTICE (other) by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc of Firm Name Change (Sparks, John) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#48

(#48) ORDER granting #46 Asley E. Quinn, Esq.'s motion to withdraw as counsel for defendants...the clerk of court is directed to strike Ms. Quinn's name as counsel of record for defendants Anda, Inc., and Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 12/20/2019. (lam) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#47

(#47) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharma Inc . (Evans, Kyle) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#46

(#46) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Quinn, Ashley) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#45

(#45) ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D Evans on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Evans, Kyle) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

1 #51

Exhibit 51 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by CVS et al

1 #50

Exhibit 50 Notice of Bankruptcy by Purdue Pharma

1 #28

Exhibit 28 Summons - AmerisourceBergen Corporation

1 #25

Exhibit 25 Summons - Insys Therapeutics Inc

1 #24

Exhibit 24 Summons - Mallinckrodt LLC

1 #23

Exhibit 23 Summons - Mallinckrodt PLC

1 #22

Exhibit 22 Summons - Actavis LLC

1 #21

Exhibit 21 Summons - Watson Laboratories Inc

1 #20

Exhibit 20 Summons - Watson Pharma Inc

167 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Joint Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) as to Perry Fine, M.D. and Lynn Webster, M.D. filed by Board of County Commissioners of Logan County. (Puckett, Tony) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Western. Case number 5:19-cv-00984. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Northern Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (ank) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) NOTICE (other) by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc of Firm Name Change (Sparks, John) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER granting #46 Asley E. Quinn, Esq.'s motion to withdraw as counsel for defendants...the clerk of court is directed to strike Ms. Quinn's name as counsel of record for defendants Anda, Inc., and Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 12/20/2019. (lam) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharma Inc . (Evans, Kyle) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Quinn, Ashley) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D Evans on behalf of Anda Inc, Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc (Evans, Kyle) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle D Evans on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharma Inc (Evans, Kyle) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ENTRY of Appearance by Robert G McCampbell on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharma Inc (McCampbell, Robert) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Corp (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by McKesson Corp . (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket, #2 Exhibit Petition, #3 Exhibit Summonses, #4 Exhibit Entry, #5 Exhibit Motion, #6 Exhibit Notice, #7 Exhibit Motion, #8 Exhibit Entry, #9 Exhibit Entry, #10 Exhibit Entry, #11 Exhibit Entry, #12 Exhibit Motion, #13 Exhibit Order, #14 Exhibit Order, #15 Exhibit Order, #16 Exhibit Entry, #17 Exhibit Motion, #18 Exhibit Motion, #19 Exhibit Notice, #20 Exhibit Order, #21 Exhibit Authorities)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTER ORDER directing the parties to file their entries of appearance conforming to LCvR83.4 not later than 10/31/2019. Signed by Honorable Joe Heaton on 10/29/2019. (lam) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3024732. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Logan County District Court, case number CJ-2019-35 filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Service Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 State-Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 Petition, #4 Exhibit 4 Summons - Purdue Pharma Inc, #5 Exhibit 5 Summons - Purdue Pharma LP, #6 Exhibit 6 Summons - Purdue Frederick Co, #7 Exhibit 7 Summons - Cephalon Inc, #8 Exhibit 8 Summons - Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, #9 Exhibit 9 Summons - Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, #10 Exhibit 10 Summons - Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #11 Exhibit 11 Summons - Johnson & Johnson, #12 Exhibit 12 Summons - Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #13 Exhibit 13 Summons - Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, #14 Exhibit 14 Summons - Endo Health Solutions Inc, #15 Exhibit 15 Summons - Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, #16 Exhibit 16 Summons - Allergan PLC, #17 Exhibit 17 Summons - Actavis PLC, #18 Exhibit 18 Summons - Actavis Pharma Inc, #19 Exhibit 19 Summons - Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, #20 Exhibit 20 Summons - Watson Pharma Inc, #21 Exhibit 21 Summons - Watson Laboratories Inc, #22 Exhibit 22 Summons - Actavis LLC, #23 Exhibit 23 Summons - Mallinckrodt PLC, #24 Exhibit 24 Summons - Mallinckrodt LLC, #25 Exhibit 25 Summons - Insys Therapeutics Inc, #26 Exhibit 26 Summons - McKesson Corporation, #27 Exhibit 27 Summons - Cardinal Health Inc, #28 Exhibit 28 Summons - AmerisourceBergen Corporation, #29 Exhibit 29 Summons - Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, #30 Exhibit 30 Summons - Anda Inc, #31 Exhibit 31 Summons - GCP Pharma LLC, #32 Exhibit 32 Summons - Keysource Medical Inc, #33 Exhibit 33 Summons - Morris & Dickson Co LLC, #34 Exhibit 34 Summons - Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #35 Exhibit 35 Summons - Harvard Drug Group, #36 Exhibit 36 Summons - Physicians Total Care Inc, #37 Exhibit 37 Summons - Physicians Total Care Inc, #38 Exhibit 38 Summons - CVS Health Corporation, #39 Exhibit 39 Summons - CVS Pharmacy Inc, #40 Exhibit 40 Summons - Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, #41 Exhibit 41 Summons - Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc aka Walgreen Co, #42 Exhibit 42 Summons - Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc aka Walgreen Co, #43 Exhibit 43 Summons - William Valuck MD, #44 Exhibit 44 Summons - Harvey Jenkins MD, #45 Exhibit 45 Summons - Perry Fine MD, #46 Exhibit 46 Summons - Lynn Webster MD, #47 Exhibit 47 Summons - Physicians Total Care Inc, #48 Exhibit 48 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #49 Exhibit 49 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #50 Exhibit 50 Notice of Bankruptcy by Purdue Pharma, #51 Exhibit 51 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by CVS et al, #52 Exhibit 52 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Cardinal Health Inc, #53 Exhibit 53 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Harvard Drug Group LLC, #54 Exhibit 54 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for McKesson Corporation, #55 Exhibit 55 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by McKesson et al, #56 Exhibit 56 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, #57 Exhibit 57 Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #58 Exhibit 58 Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by McKesson et al, #59 Exhibit 59 Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by CVS et al, #60 Exhibit 60 Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Anda, #61 Exhibit 61 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Anda, #62 Exhibit 62 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Endo, #63 Exhibit 63 Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time by Endo, #64 Exhibit 64 Notice of Federal Preliminary Injunction Order, #65 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv) [Transferred from okwd on 2/10/2020.] (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Physicians Total Care Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where KEYSOURCE MEDICAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Walgreens Boots Alliance Incorporated is a litigant