This case was last updated from PACER on 02/29/2020 at 08:05:01 (UTC).

Board of County Commissioners of Grady County v. Purdue Pharma LP et al

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 Board of County Commissioners of Grady County filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Purdue Pharma LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-OP-46167

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Defendants

Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

MD William Valuck

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Mallinckrodt LLC

Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Mallinckrodt PLC

Insys Therapeutics, Inc.

Purdue Frederick Company, The

Physicians Total Care Inc

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.

Allergan PLC

Keysource Medical, Inc.

Teva Pharmeceuticals USA, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Russell Portenoy

Actavis LLC

Actavis plc

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

G. Calvin Sharpe

Attorney at Phillips Murrah

101 N Robinson, Suite 1300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Michael W. Ridgeway

Attorney at Odom Sparks & Jones

140 Hipoint Office Bldg., 2500 S. Mcgee Drive

Norman, OK 73072

John H. Sparks

Attorney at Odom Sparks & Jones

140 Hipoint Office Bldg., 2500 S. Mcgee Drive

Norman, OK 73072

Joshua D. Burns

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy

Braniff Building, Ste. 100, 324 N. Robinson Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Evan H. Way

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy

100 Braniff Building, 324 N. Robinson Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Sanford C. Coats

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy

Braniff Building, Ste. 100, 324 N. Robinson Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Joe Michael Hampton

Attorney at Corbyn Hampton Barghols Pierce

211 North Robinson Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Amy Jo Pierce

Attorney at Corbyn Hampton Barghols Pierce

211 North Robinson Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Robert G. McCampbell

Attorney at Gable & Gotwals

15Th Floor, 211 N. Robinson Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Nicholas V. Merkley

Attorney at Gable & Gotwals

15Th Floor, 211 N. Robinson Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Other Attorneys

Todd A. Court

Attorney at McAfee & Taft - Oklahoma City

10Th Floor, Two Leadership Square, 211 North Robinson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Robert A. Bragalone

Attorney at Gordon & Rees - Dallas

2100 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Matthew J. Sill

Attorney at Fulmer Sill Law Group

1101 North Broadway Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

Tony G. Puckett

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

10Th Floor, Two Leadership Square, 211 N Robinson Ave.

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7103

Ryan A. Ray

Attorney at Norman Wohlgemuth Chandler & Jeter

401 S. Boston

Tulsa, OK 74103

Stuart D. Campbell

Attorney at Doerner Saunders Daniel & Anderson

Two W. Second Street

Tulsa, OK 74103

D. Michael McBride, III

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy

321 S. Boston

Tulsa, OK 74103

Kaylee Davis-Maddy

Attorney at Doerner Saunders Daniel & Anderson

Tenth Floor, 105 N. Hudson

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Harrison C. Lujan

Attorney at Fulmer Sill Law Group

1101 North Broadway Avenue

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

Susan E. Huntsman

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy -Tulsa

500 Kennedy Bldg., 321 South Boston Avenue

Tulsa, OK 74103

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

51 #1

*Restricted*

#51

(#51) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Western. Case number 5:19-cv-00703. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#50

(#50) TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#49

(#49) ORDER granting #37 the Anda Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 12/6/2019. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 12/06/2019)

42 #9

Exhibit Cal. Stay Order

42 #8

Exhibit Wis. Stay Order

42 #7

Exhibit Conditional Transfer Order

37 #1

Exhibit 1-District Court Order

#37

(#49) ORDER granting #37 the Anda Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 12/6/2019. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #38

Exhibit 038 - Summons to Russell Portenoy MD

1 #37

Exhibit 037 - Summons to Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc

1 #36

Exhibit 036 - Summons to Purdue Pharma LP

1 #35

Exhibit 035 - Summons to Purdue Pharma Inc

1 #34

Exhibit 034 - Summons to Physicials Total Care Inc -3

1 #33

Exhibit 033 - Summons to Physicials Total Care Inc -2

1 #32

Exhibit 032 - Summons to Physicials Total Care Inc -1

1 #31

Exhibit 031 - Summons to Perry Fine MD

1 #30

Exhibit 030 - Summons to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc

244 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Oklahoma Western. Case number 5:19-cv-00703. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Ohio for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) ORDER granting #37 the Anda Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 12/6/2019. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case filed by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) ENTRY of Appearance by Don W Danz on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc (Danz, Don) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) RESPONSE to Motion re #42 JOINT MOTION to Stay Case filed by Board of County Commissioners of Grady County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Opioid MDL Dkt. No. 130, #2 Exhibit 2 - Opioid MDL Dkt. No. 232)(Court, Todd) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) ORDER granting #44 Attorney Sanford Coats Motion for Withdrawal as Counsel of Record. Attorney Sanford C Coats terminated. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 9/25/2019. (ks) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by The Purdue Frederick Company, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP. (Coats, Sanford) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) RESPONSE in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Remand filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) JOINT MOTION to Stay Case by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Harvard Drug Group LLC The, McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ada OK Stay Order, #2 Exhibit Seminole OK Stay Order, #3 Exhibit Osage OK Stay Order, #4 Exhibit Pawnee OK Stay Order, #5 Exhibit Delaware OK Stay Order, #6 Exhibit Order Granting Motion to Stay, #7 Exhibit Conditional Transfer Order, #8 Exhibit Wis. Stay Order, #9 Exhibit Cal. Stay Order, #10 Exhibit Ky. Stay Order, #11 Exhibit 6 County Transfer Order, #12 Exhibit 1 County Transfer Order, #13 Exhibit 7 County Transfer Order, #14 Exhibit 6 County Transfer Order, #15 Exhibit Alameda CA Stay Order, #16 Exhibit Portland ME Stay Order, #17 Exhibit EDVA Stay Order, #18 Exhibit WDVA Stay Order, #19 Exhibit Cal. Stay Order, #20 Exhibit Ill. Stay Order, #21 Exhibit Fla. Deferral Order)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by McKesson Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - Return of Service (Jenkins), #5 Exhibit 5 - Denial of Plaintiff_s Allegations (Valuck), #6 Exhibit 6 - Return of Service (Portenoy), #7 Exhibit 7 - Return of Service (Valuck), #8 Exhibit 8 - Return of Service (Webster), #9 Exhibit 9 - Entry of Appearance (Quest), #10 Exhibit 10 - Motion for Enlargement (Quest), #11 Exhibit 11 - Return of Service (Actavis LLC), #12 Exhibit 12 - Return of Service (Actavis Pharma), #13 Exhibit 13 - Return of Service (Actavis PLC), #14 Exhibit 14 - Return of Service (Allergan), #15 Exhibit 15 - Return of Service (Anda Inc.), #16 Exhibit 16 - Return of Service (Cardinal), #17 Exhibit 17 - Return of Service (Cephalon), #18 Exhibit 18 - Return of Service (CVS Pharmacy), #19 Exhibit 19 - Return of Service (Endo Pharma), #20 Exhibit 20 - Return of Service (Janssen Pharm RA CT Corp Sys), #21 Exhibit 21 - Return of Service (Janssen Pharm RA CT Corp System), #22 Exhibit 22 - Return of Service (Johnson & Johnson), #23 Exhibit 23 - Return of Service (Keysource), #24 Exhibit 24 - Return of Service (McKesson), #25 Exhibit 25 - Return of Service (Morris & Dickson), #26 Exhibit 26 - Return of Service (OK CVS Pharmacy), #27 Exhibit 27 - Return of Service (Ortho-McNeil), #28 Exhibit 28 - Return of Service (Physicians Total Care-RA OK Sec St), #29 Exhibit 29 - Return of Service (Physicians Total), #30 Exhibit 30 - Return of Service (Purdua Pharma), #31 Exhibit 31 - Return of Service (Quest), #32 Exhibit 32 - Return of Service (Teva), #33 Exhibit 33 - Return of Service (Walgreens Boots Alliance RA Corp Serv Co), #34 Exhibit 34 - Return of Service (Watson Pharma), #35 Exhibit 35 - Return of Service (Anda), #36 Exhibit 36 - Return of Service (Mallinckrodt LLC), #37 Exhibit 37 - Return of Service (Mallinckrodt PLC), #38 Exhibit 38 - Return of Service (Purdue Frederick), #39 Exhibit 39 - Return of Service (Purdue Pharma Inc.), #40 Exhibit 40 - Return of Service (Walgreens Boots Alliance RA IL Corp), #41 Exhibit 41 - Return of Service (Watson Lab), #42 Exhibit 42 - Return of Service (Watson Pharm), #43 Exhibit 43 - Entry of Appearance (AmerisourceBergen), #44 Exhibit 44 - Entry of Appearance (McKesson), #45 Exhibit 45 - Unopposed Motion & Special Appearance (McKesson), #46 Exhibit 46 - CVS Special Appearance & Motion for Enlargement, #47 Exhibit 47 - Entry of Appearance (Cardinal), #48 Exhibit 48 - Order Granting CVS Motion for Enlargement, #49 Exhibit 49 - Order Granting Motion for Enlargement (McKesson), #50 Exhibit 50 - Order Granting Motion for Enlargement (Quest), #51 Exhibit 51 - Motion for Extension (MF Defendants), #52 Exhibit 52 - Order Granting Anda Defs Motion for Enlargment of Time to Answer, #53 Exhibit 53 - Order Granting MF Defs Motion for Ext of Time to Respond to Petition, #54 Exhibit 54 - Unopposed Motion for Enlargment of Time to Answer and Special Appearance (Anda Defs), #55 Exhibit 55 - Entry of Appearance (Anda Defs), #56 Exhibit 56 - LCvR7.1)(Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Stuart D Campbell on behalf of McKesson Corp (Campbell, Stuart) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ENTRY of Appearance by D Michael McBride, III on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (McBride, D) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation . (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Susan E Huntsman on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Huntsman, Susan) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Endo Health Solutions Inc . (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Raymond E Zschiesche on behalf of Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2969661. (Zschiesche, Raymond) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Grady County, case number CJ-2019-12 filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 001 - Service Documents, #2 Exhibit 002 - State-Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 003 - Petition, #4 Exhibit 004 - Summons to Harvard Drug, #5 Exhibit 005 - Summons to Actavis Pharma, #6 Exhibit 006 - Summons to Actavis PLC, #7 Exhibit 007 - Summons to Allergan PLC, #8 Exhibit 008 - Summons to AmerisourceBergen Corporation, #9 Exhibit 009 - Summons to Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, #10 Exhibit 010 - Summons to Anda Inc, #11 Exhibit 011 - Summons to Cardinal Health Inc, #12 Exhibit 012 - Summons to Cephalon Inc, #13 Exhibit 013 - Summons to CVS Health Corporation, #14 Exhibit 014 - Summons to CVS Pharmacy Inc, #15 Exhibit 015 - Summons to Endo Health Solutions Inc, #16 Exhibit 016 - Summons to Endo Pharmaceuticals inc, #17 Exhibit 017 - Summons to GCP Pharma LLC, #18 Exhibit 018 - Summons to Harvey Jenkins MD, #19 Exhibit 019 - Summons to Insys Therapeutics Inc, #20 Exhibit 020 - Summons to Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, #21 Exhibit 021 - Summons to Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #22 Exhibit 022 - Summons to Johnson & Johnson, #23 Exhibit 023 - Summons to Keysource Medical Inc, #24 Exhibit 024 - Summons to Lynn Webster MD, #25 Exhibit 025 - Summons to Mallinckrodt LLC, #26 Exhibit 026 - Summons to Mallinckrodt PLC, #27 Exhibit 027 - Summons to McKesson Corporation, #28 Exhibit 028 - Summons to Morris & Dickson Co LLC, #29 Exhibit 029 - Summons to Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, #30 Exhibit 030 - Summons to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #31 Exhibit 031 - Summons to Perry Fine MD, #32 Exhibit 032 - Summons to Physicials Total Care Inc -1, #33 Exhibit 033 - Summons to Physicials Total Care Inc -2, #34 Exhibit 034 - Summons to Physicials Total Care Inc -3, #35 Exhibit 035 - Summons to Purdue Pharma Inc, #36 Exhibit 036 - Summons to Purdue Pharma LP, #37 Exhibit 037 - Summons to Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #38 Exhibit 038 - Summons to Russell Portenoy MD, #39 Exhibit 039 - Summons to Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, #40 Exhibit 040 - Summons to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, #41 Exhibit 041 - Summons to The Harvard Drug Group, #42 Exhibit 042 - Summons to The Purdue Frederick Company (1), #43 Exhibit 043 - Summons to Watson Laboratories Inc, #44 Exhibit 044 - Summons to Watson Pharma Inc, #45 Exhibit 045 - Summons to Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, #46 Exhibit 046 - Summons to William Valuck MD, #47 Exhibit 047 - Summons to Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc -1, #48 Exhibit 048 - Summons to Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc -2, #49 Exhibit 049 - Summons to Actavis LLC, #50 Exhibit 050 - Return of Service for Summons to Harvey Jenkins MD, #51 Exhibit 051 - Answer-Denial by William Valuck MD, #52 Exhibit 052 - Return of Service for Summons to Lynn Webster MD, #53 Exhibit 053 - Return of Service for Summons to Russell Portenoy MD, #54 Exhibit 054 - Return of Service for Summons to William Valuck MD, #55 Exhibit 055 - Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #56 Exhibit 056 - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc), #57 Exhibit 057 - Return of Service for Summons to Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC, #58 Exhibit 058 - Return of Service for Summons to Actavis Pharma, #59 Exhibit 059 - Return of Service for Summons to CVS Pharmacy Inc, #60 Exhibit 060 - Return of Service for Summons to Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc -1, #61 Exhibit 061 - Return of Service for Summons to Allergan PLC, #62 Exhibit 062 - Return of Service for Summons to Anda Inc, #63 Exhibit 063 - Return of Service for Summons to Actavis PLC, #64 Exhibit 064 - Return of Service for Summons to Endo Pharmaceuticals inc, #65 Exhibit 065 - Return of Service for Summons to Morris & Dickson Co LLC, #66 Exhibit 066 - Return of Service for Summons to McKesson Corporation, #67 Exhibit 067 - Return of Service for Summons to Physicials Total Care Inc -2, #68 Exhibit 068 - Return of Service for Summons to Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc, #69 Exhibit 069 - Return of Service for Summons to Purdue Pharma LP, #70 Exhibit 070 - Return of Service for Summons to Watson Pharma Inc, #71 Exhibit 071 - Return of Service for Summons to Keysource Medical Inc, #72 Exhibit 072 - Return of Service for Summons to Physicials Total Care Inc -3, #73 Exhibit 073 - Return of Service for Summons to Cardinal Health Inc, #74 Exhibit 074 - Return of Service for Summons to Johnson & Johnson, #75 Exhibit 075 - Return of Service for Summons to Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #76 Exhibit 076 - Return of Service for Summons to Actavis LLC, #77 Exhibit 077 - Return of Service for Summons to Cephalon Inc, #78 Exhibit 078 - Return of Service for Summons to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, #79 Exhibit 079 - Return of Service for Summons to Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, #80 Exhibit 080 - Return of Service for Summons to Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, #81 Exhibit 081 - Return of Service for Summons to Anda Pharmaceuticals Inc, #82 Exhibit 082 - Return of Service for Summons to Purdue Pharma Inc, #83 Exhibit 083 - Return of Service for Summons to Mallinckrodt PLC, #84 Exhibit 084 - Return of Service for Summons to Mallinckrodt LLC, #85 Exhibit 085 - Return of Service for Summons to The Purdue Frederick Company, #86 Exhibit 086 - Return of Service for Summons to Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc -2, #87 Exhibit 087 - Return of Service for Summons to Watson Laboratories Inc, #88 Exhibit 088 - Return of Service for Summons to Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, #89 Exhibit 089 - Entry of Appearance by Attorney for AmerisourceBergen Corporation, #90 Exhibit 090 - Entry of Appearance by Attorney for McKesson Corporation, #91 Exhibit 091 - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (McKesson Corp and AmerisourceBergen Drug), #92 Exhibit 092 - Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Cardinal Health Inc, #93 Exhibit 093 - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (CVS and Walgreens), #94 Exhibit 094 - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (CVS and Walgreens), #95 Exhibit 095 - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Manufacturer Defendants), #96 Exhibit 096 - Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Substitute Party, #97 Exhibit 097 - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Quest Pharmaceuticals Inc), #98 Exhibit 098 - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Manufacturer Defendants), #99 Exhibit 099 - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Anda), #100 Exhibit 100 - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Anda), #101 Exhibit 101 - Entry of Appearance by Attorney for Anda, #102 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) [Transferred from okwd on 12/31/2019.] (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Physicians Total Care Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where KEYSOURCE MEDICAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Walgreens Boots Alliance Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant