This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2020 at 08:19:22 (UTC).

Boal et al v. Schoenmann

Case Summary

On 03/04/2020 Boal filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Schoenmann. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01610

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Appellants

Steven R. Boal

Quotient Technology, Inc.

Appellee

E. Lynn Schoenmann

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Elliot Remsen Peters

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Brook Dooley

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Victor T. Chiu

Attorney at Keker Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

David Samuel Houska

Attorney at Cooley LLP

101 California Street, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Matthew David Caplan

Attorney at Cooley LLP

101 California Street, 5Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-5800

Jayme Breanna Staten

Attorney at Cooley LLP

4401 Eastgate Mall

San Diego, CA 92121

Appellee Attorneys

Tyler Roberts Meade

Attorney at The Meade Firm P.C.

12 Funston Ave.

San Francisco, CA 94129

Samuel Ivan Ferguson

Attorney at The Meade Firm p.c.

12 Funston Avenue, Suite A

San Francisco, CA 94129

Seena Forouzan

Attorney at The Meade Firm p.c.

12 Funston Avenue, Suite A

San Francisco, CA 94129

Anne Orelind Decker

Attorney at The Meade Firm

12 Funston Avenue, Suite A

San Francisco, CA 94129

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Transmittal of documents

1 #2

Docket sheet

#2

#3

3 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#4

4 #1

Request for Judicial Notice with Exhibit A

#5

#7

7 #1

Docket sheet

7 #2

Motion to withdraw reference

7 #3

Transmittal

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER of Recommendation regarding Motion to withdraw the Reference by Judge Montali. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2020: #1 Docket sheet, #2 Motion to withdraw reference, #3 Transmittal) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE HEARING FROM 4/23/2020 TO 5/28/2020 RE #1 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2020) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE re #1 Withdrawal of Reference, #4 Response ( Non Motion ) ISO Motion to Withdraw Reference by Steven R. Boal. (Peters, Elliot) (Filed on 4/2/2020) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • DocketPlease ignore the deadline just sent - filed in error. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RESPONSE re #3 Notice (Other) re Withdrawal of Reference by E. Lynn Schoenmann. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice with Exhibit A)(Meade, Tyler) (Filed on 3/19/2020) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket*** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. PLEASE DISREGARD *** Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 : Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Vince Chhabria. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020) (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Steven R. Boal re #1 Withdrawal of Reference, (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Peters, Elliot) (Filed on 3/6/2020) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CLERK'S NOTICE to counsel re Notice of Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2020) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Withdrawal of Bankruptcy Reference Upon Order of the Court. Bankruptcy Court case number 08-30119 DM, Adv# 20-03007. Filed bySteven R. Boal, Quotient Technology, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of documents, #2 Docket sheet)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2020) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less