This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/25/2021 at 09:12:57 (UTC).

BO DO KO USA, INC. v. FH GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 BO DO KO USA, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against FH GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark Falk and William J. Martini. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-06965

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark Falk

Presiding Judge

William J. Martini

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BO DO KO USA, INC.

Defendant

FH GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEPHEN JEFFREY WEAVER

Attorney at AHN IP LAW

12100 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 807

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

ROLANDO A. DIAZ

Attorney at Dunlap Bennett & Ludwig, PLLC

1000 N West St #1203

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Complaint

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/7/2021 at 11:00 AM before Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk on 5/24/21. (LM, ) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by FH GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (DIAZ, ROLANDO) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by FH GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC..(DIAZ, ROLANDO) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to FH GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO120 Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (lag, ) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (jr) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Summons to be Issued by BO DO KO USA, INC. as to FH GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (WEAVER, STEPHEN) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BO DO KO USA, INC.. (WEAVER, STEPHEN) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against FH GROUP INTERNATIONAL, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12311425) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BO DO KO USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(WEAVER, STEPHEN) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FH Group International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BO DO KO USA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant