This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/17/2021 at 09:49:45 (UTC).

BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Sterling Freight, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 BMO Harris Bank N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sterling Freight, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine D Little and John E Dowdell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00121

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christine D Little

Presiding Judge

John E Dowdell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BMO Harris Bank N.A.

Defendants

Sterling Freight, Inc

Randell Neel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James K Haney

Attorney at Wong Fleming PC

821 Alexander Rd Ste 200

Princeton, NJ 08540

 

Court Documents

12 #5

Proposed Order

12 #4

Certificate of Service

12 #3

Non-Military Affidavit

12 #2

Exhibit A - BHB Certification in Support

12 #1

Declaration in Support

#12

(#12) MOTION for Default Judgment against Sterling Freight, Inc and Randell Neel by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (With attachments) (Haney, James) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#11

(#11) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Court Clerk ; granting #10 Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

10 #3

Proposed Order

10 #2

Non-Military Affidavit as to Randell Neel

10 #1

Certification in Support

#10

(#10) MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Sterling Freight, Inc and Randell Neel by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (With attachments) (Haney, James) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Sterling Freight, Inc (Re: #2 Complaint ) by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Haney, James) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Randell Neel (Re: #2 Complaint ) by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Haney, James) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Dismissal dismissing Count III Only, (Re: #2 Complaint ) by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Haney, James) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#6

(#6) LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to James K Haney (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

2 #2

Exhibit B - Continuing Guaranty

2 #1

Exhibit A - Loan and Security Agreement

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Randell Neel, Sterling Freight, Inc (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2376086) by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (With attachments) (Haney, James) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Default Judgment against Sterling Freight, Inc and Randell Neel by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (With attachments) (Haney, James) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Court Clerk ; granting #10 Motion for Entry of Default by Clerk (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk against Sterling Freight, Inc and Randell Neel by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (With attachments) (Haney, James) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Sterling Freight, Inc (Re: #2 Complaint ) by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Haney, James) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Randell Neel (Re: #2 Complaint ) by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Haney, James) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Dismissal dismissing Count III Only, (Re: #2 Complaint ) by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Haney, James) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to James K Haney (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Randell Neel, Sterling Freight, Inc (ll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing BMO Harris Bank N.A. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent BMO Financial Corp. for BMO Harris Bank N.A.) by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Haney, James) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Randell Neel, Sterling Freight, Inc (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2376086) by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (With attachments) (Haney, James) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Haney, James) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James K Haney