This case was last updated from PACER on 05/15/2021 at 11:12:56 (UTC).

BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Midwest Refrigeration, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2021 BMO Harris Bank N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Midwest Refrigeration, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alice R. Senechal and Peter D. Welte. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00062

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alice R. Senechal

Presiding Judge

Peter D. Welte

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BMO Harris Bank N.A.

Defendants

Midwest Refrigeration, Inc.

Mark Yozamp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James K. Haney

Attorney at Wong Fleming

821 Alexander Road, Suite 200

Princeton, NJ 08540

Defendant Attorney

Ross A. Nilson

Attorney at Nilson Brand Law

4133 30Th Ave S, Suite 100

Fargo, ND 58104

 

Court Documents

8 #4

Proposed Order

8 #3

Certificate of Service

8 #2

Exhibit A- Certification in Support of Motion

8 #1

Declaration in Support of Motion

#8

#7

6 #2

Proposed Order

6 #1

Affidavit for Entry of Default

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #5

D - Continuing Guaranty dated 06/26/2019

1 #4

C - Amortization Schedules dated 07/24/2020

1 #3

B - Reschedule Agreement dated 04/16/2020

1 #2

A - Loan and Security Agreement dated 06/26/2019

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Default Judgment as to defendant Midwest Refrigeration Inc. ONLY by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A- Certification in Support of Motion, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Proposed Order)(Haney, James) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/13/2021 to remove overlapping headers) Regenerated NEF (mf) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Midwest Refrigeration, Inc. (sj) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Midwest Refrigeration, Inc. only by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit for Entry of Default, #2 Proposed Order)(Haney, James) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. Midwest Refrigeration, Inc. served on 4/10/2021, answer due 5/3/2021 (Haney, James) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Mark Yozamp.(Nilson, Ross) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. Mark Yozamp served on 3/20/2021, answer due 4/12/2021 (Haney, James) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Midwest Refrigeration, Inc., Mark Yozamp. (pb) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Midwest Refrigeration, Inc., Mark Yozamp (Filing fee $402, receipt number 321000200) filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Loan and Security Agreement dated 06/26/2019, #3 Exhibit B - Reschedule Agreement dated 04/16/2020, #4 Exhibit C - Amortization Schedules dated 07/24/2020, #5 Exhibit D - Continuing Guaranty dated 06/26/2019)(pb) Modified on 3/17/2021 to add 'Exhibit' to attachments. (rh) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James K Haney