This case was last updated from PACER on 10/27/2020 at 07:46:19 (UTC).

BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. v. Ezel Logistics LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/28/2020 BMO HARRIS BANK N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ezel Logistics LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN M. YOUNGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04239

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN M. YOUNGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.

Defendants

Ezel Logistics LLC

Kamal Khasanov

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DWAYNE F. STANLEY

Attorney at HUSCH BLACKWELL LLP

190 Carondelet Plaza, Suite 600

St. Louis, MO 63105

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Affidavit

#3

(#3) Request for Default BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(STANLEY, DWAYNE) Modified on 10/22/2020 (nd, ). (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#2

(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jodi L. Broder re: served Civil Cover Sheet, Case Management Track Designation Form, Designation Form, Summons, Verified Complaint upon 1) Ezel Logistics, LLC 2) Kamal Khasanov by Personal on September 4, 2020 (STANLEY, DWAYNE) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

1 #3

Case Management Track Form Case Management Track Form

1 #2

Designation Form Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Verified against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14528799.), filed by BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form Case Management Track Form)(STANLEY, DWAYNE) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDefault Entered (sg, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT BY Ezel Logistics LLC, Kamal Khasanov FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (sg, ) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Default BMO HARRIS BANK N.A. against All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(STANLEY, DWAYNE) Modified on 10/22/2020 (nd, ). (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Jodi L. Broder re: served Civil Cover Sheet, Case Management Track Designation Form, Designation Form, Summons, Verified Complaint upon 1) Ezel Logistics, LLC 2) Kamal Khasanov by Personal on September 4, 2020 (STANLEY, DWAYNE) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Ezel Logistics LLC, Kamal Khasanov. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 8/31/2020 (bw, ) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Verified against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14528799.), filed by BMO HARRIS BANK N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form Case Management Track Form)(STANLEY, DWAYNE) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less