This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:12:41 (UTC).

BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Dolan

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 BMO Harris Bank N A filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Dolan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Justin R. Walker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00919

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Justin R. Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BMO Harris Bank N.A.

Defendant

Michael Dolan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

April A. Wimberg

Attorney at Dentons Bingham Greenbaum LLP - Louisville

101 S. Fifth Street, Suite 3500

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Michael Dolan Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3005412., filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - First Loan and Security Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Second Loan and Security Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - Third Loan and Security Agreement, #5 Exhibit D - Continuing Guaranty) (DJT) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A - First Loan and Security Agreement

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Michael Dolan. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. Michael Dolan served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Wimberg, April) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit D - Continuing Guaranty

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent BMO Financial Corp., Corporate Parent Bank of Montreal for BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (DJT) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#3

(#3) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (DJT) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

5 #1

Proof of Service

7 #2

Motion for Entry of Default

7 #1

Affidavit April A. Wimberg in Support of Clerk's Entry of Default

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM NAME by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Wimberg, April) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit B - Second Loan and Security Agreement

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION Re:PDF re: #7 MOTION for Entry of Default ; Correct document attached to this entry. (Wimberg, April) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit C - Third Loan and Security Agreement

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION Re:PDF re: #7 MOTION for Entry of Default ; Correct document attached to this entry. (Wimberg, April) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit April A. Wimberg in Support of Clerk's Entry of Default) (Wimberg, April) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/31/2020: #2 Motion for Entry of Default) (JM). (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM NAME by BMO Harris Bank N.A. (Wimberg, April) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. Michael Dolan served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Wimberg, April) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Michael Dolan. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Justin R. Walker. (DJT) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent BMO Financial Corp., Corporate Parent Bank of Montreal for BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (DJT) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Michael Dolan Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-3005412., filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - First Loan and Security Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Second Loan and Security Agreement, #4 Exhibit C - Third Loan and Security Agreement, #5 Exhibit D - Continuing Guaranty) (DJT) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.