This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/01/2022 at 18:39:28 (UTC).

BMF Wallets, LLC v. Miramax, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 BMF Wallets, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Miramax, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Daniel J. Albregts. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02181

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Daniel J. Albregts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BMF Wallets, LLC

Defendant

Miramax, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Gile

Attorney at Gile Law Group Ltd.

1180 N. Town Center Drive, Suite 100

Las Vegas, NV 89144

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff BMF Wallets, LLC. (Gile, Ryan) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Extend Time re #1 Complaint. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint from March 18, 2022, to April 1, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/18/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Extend Time (Fifth Request) re #1 Complaint,, #13 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Plaintiff BMF Wallets, LLC. (Gile, Ryan) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#13

(#13) ORDER Granting #12 Motion to Extend Time. Miramax, LLC answer due 3/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/3/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Extend Time (Fourth Request) to Answer/Respond to #1 Complaint re #11 Order, by Plaintiff BMF Wallets, LLC. (Gile, Ryan) Modified on 3/3/2022 to link document to Order (SLD). (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER Granting #10 Motion to Extend Time. Miramax, LLC answer due 3/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 2/18/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Extend Time (Third Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff BMF Wallets, LLC. (Gile, Ryan) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER Granting #8 Motion to Extend Time. Miramax, LLC answer due 2/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff BMF Wallets, LLC. (Gile, Ryan) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to File Answer to Complaint. Miramax, LLC answer due 2/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff BMF Wallets, LLC. (Gile, Ryan) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Miramax, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6728261) by BMF Wallets, LLC. Proof of service due by 3/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gile, Ryan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/10/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated re #16 Notice Voluntary Dismissal. (JQC) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff BMF Wallets, LLC. (Gile, Ryan) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #14 Motion to Extend Time re #1 Complaint. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint from March 18, 2022, to April 1, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/18/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Extend Time (Fifth Request) re #1 Complaint,, #13 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, by Plaintiff BMF Wallets, LLC. (Gile, Ryan) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER Granting #12 Motion to Extend Time. Miramax, LLC answer due 3/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/3/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Extend Time (Fourth Request) to Answer/Respond to #1 Complaint re #11 Order, by Plaintiff BMF Wallets, LLC. (Gile, Ryan) Modified on 3/3/2022 to link document to Order (SLD). (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Granting #10 Motion to Extend Time. Miramax, LLC answer due 3/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 2/18/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Extend Time (Third Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff BMF Wallets, LLC. (Gile, Ryan) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Granting #8 Motion to Extend Time. Miramax, LLC answer due 2/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/27/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff BMF Wallets, LLC. (Gile, Ryan) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to File Answer to Complaint. Miramax, LLC answer due 2/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff BMF Wallets, LLC. (Gile, Ryan) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (KF) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/10/2021) (KF). (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Miramax, LLC re #1 Complaint. (KF) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (KF) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by BMF Wallets, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gile, Ryan) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Miramax, LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6728261) by BMF Wallets, LLC. Proof of service due by 3/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Gile, Ryan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Miramax, llc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Gile