This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/28/2022 at 18:34:20 (UTC).

BMF Advance, LLC v. Texas Medical Technology, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/25/2022 BMF Advance, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Texas Medical Technology, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sim Lake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-01317

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sim Lake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BMF ADVANCE, LLC

Defendants

TEXAS MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC.

JAD SHRAIM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandon James Gibbons

Defendant Attorney

Christopher Michael Raney

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/26/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by BMF Advance, LLC, filed.(Gibbons, Brandon) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jad Shraim, Texas Medical Technology, Inc., filed.(Raney, Christopher) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

5 #5

Main Document

5 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) CLERKS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - Initial Conference set for 8/26/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sim Lake is CANCELED. Parties notified, filed. (sanderson, 4) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#7

(#7) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/21/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 11/18/2022. Pltf Expert Witness List/Reports due by 1/27/2023. Deft Expert Witness List/Reports due by 3/10/2023. Discovery due by 4/28/2023. Pretrial Motions/Motions in Limine due by 6/2/2023. Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/7/2023...*** Docket Call set for 7/14/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER - The #1 Notice of Removal does not allege complete diversity among the parties. Accordingly, pursuant to paragraph 3 of the #2 Order for Conference and Disclosure of Interested Parties, the court will dismiss this action for lack of jurisdiction on September 16, 2022, unless plaintiff files an amended complaint by September 9, 2022, that demonstrates complete diversity among the parties...*** Amended Pleadings due by 9/9/2022. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#9

(#9) AMENDED ORDER - The #1 Notice of Removal does not allege complete diversity among the parties. Accordingly, pursuant to paragraph 3 of the #2 Order for Conference and Disclosure of Interested Parties, the court will dismiss this action for lack of jurisdiction on September 16, 2022, unless plaintiff files an amended Notice of Removal by September 9, 2022, that demonstrates complete diversity among the parties. (Amended Notice of Removal due 9/9/22) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER - The #1 Notice of Removal does not allege complete diversity among the parties. Accordingly, pursuant to paragraph 3 of the #2 Order for Conference and Disclosure of Interested Parties, the court will dismiss this action for lack of jurisdiction on September 16, 2022, unless DEFENDANT files an amended Notice of Removal by September 9, 2022, that demonstrates complete diversity among the parties...*** Amended Pleadings due by 9/9/2022. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER - The #1 Notice of Removal does not allege complete diversity among the parties. Accordingly, pursuant to paragraph 3 of the #2 Order for Conference and Disclosure of Interested Parties, the court will dismiss this action for lack of jurisdiction on September 16, 2022, unless DEFENDANT files an amended Notice of Removal by September 9, 2022, that demonstrates complete diversity among the parties...*** Amended Pleadings due by 9/9/2022. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED ORDER - The #1 Notice of Removal does not allege complete diversity among the parties. Accordingly, pursuant to paragraph 3 of the #2 Order for Conference and Disclosure of Interested Parties, the court will dismiss this action for lack of jurisdiction on September 16, 2022, unless plaintiff files an amended Notice of Removal by September 9, 2022, that demonstrates complete diversity among the parties. (Amended Notice of Removal due 9/9/22) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER - The #1 Notice of Removal does not allege complete diversity among the parties. Accordingly, pursuant to paragraph 3 of the #2 Order for Conference and Disclosure of Interested Parties, the court will dismiss this action for lack of jurisdiction on September 16, 2022, unless plaintiff files an amended complaint by September 9, 2022, that demonstrates complete diversity among the parties...*** Amended Pleadings due by 9/9/2022. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/21/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 11/18/2022. Pltf Expert Witness List/Reports due by 1/27/2023. Deft Expert Witness List/Reports due by 3/10/2023. Discovery due by 4/28/2023. Pretrial Motions/Motions in Limine due by 6/2/2023. Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/7/2023...*** Docket Call set for 7/14/2023 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLERKS NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - Initial Conference set for 8/26/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sim Lake is CANCELED. Parties notified, filed. (sanderson, 4) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by BMF Advance, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gibbons, Brandon) (Entered: 08/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jad Shraim, Texas Medical Technology, Inc., filed.(Raney, Christopher) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by BMF Advance, LLC, filed.(Gibbons, Brandon) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/26/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 133rd Judicial District Court, Harris County, Texas, case number 2022-08377 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28074643) filed by JAD SHRAIM, TEXAS MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Raney, Christopher) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less