This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/06/2023 at 08:17:02 (UTC).

Blunt v. M1 Support Services, LP

Case Summary

On 03/07/2023 Blunt filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against M1 Support Services, LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sharion Aycock and David A. Sanders. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00037

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharion Aycock

Referral Judge

David A. Sanders

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Trah Blunt

Defendant

M1 Support Services, LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Louis H Watson, Jr

Robert N. Norris

Defendant Attorneys

Tammy L. Baker

Yvonne N. Maddalena

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2214898, filed by Trah Blunt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B - EEOC RTS, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

1 #1

Exhibit A - EEOC Charge

1 #2

Exhibit B - EEOC RTS

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to M1 Support Services, LP; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert N. Norris on behalf of Trah Blunt (Norris, Robert)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louis H Watson, Jr on behalf of Trah Blunt M1 Support Services, LP served on 3/10/2023. (Watson, Louis)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by M1 Support Services, LP. (Baker, Tammy)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Yvonne N. Maddalena,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2225502) by M1 Support Services, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Alabama, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - Tennessee) (Baker, Tammy)

6 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Alabama

6 #2

Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - Tennessee

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by M1 Support Services, LP . (Baker, Tammy)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Yvonna N. Maddalena for the defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 4/3/23. (def)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yvonne N. Maddalena on behalf of M1 Support Services, LP (Maddalena, Yvonne)

#11

(#11) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to and/or Amend Plaintiff's Complaint by M1 Support Services, LP. (Maddalena, Yvonne)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Amended Complaint due by 7/20/23 OR response to #1 Complaint due by 7/27/23. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 4/21/23. (cs)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Amended Complaint due by 7/20/23 OR response to #1 Complaint due by 7/27/23. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 4/21/23. (cs)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to and/or Amend Plaintiff's Complaint by M1 Support Services, LP. (Maddalena, Yvonne)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yvonne N. Maddalena on behalf of M1 Support Services, LP (Maddalena, Yvonne)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Yvonna N. Maddalena for the defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 4/3/23. (def)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023

DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: M1 Support Services, LP answer due 4/21/2023. (jla) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defense answer or other response to the complaint is due April 21, 2023. No further order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 3/31/23. No document attached. (def)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by M1 Support Services, LP . (Baker, Tammy)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Yvonne N. Maddalena,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2225502) by M1 Support Services, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - Alabama, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - Tennessee) (Baker, Tammy)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by M1 Support Services, LP. (Baker, Tammy)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Louis H Watson, Jr on behalf of Trah Blunt M1 Support Services, LP served on 3/10/2023. (Watson, Louis)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert N. Norris on behalf of Trah Blunt (Norris, Robert)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023

DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to M1 Support Services, LP; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2214898, filed by Trah Blunt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B - EEOC RTS, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less