This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/25/2022 at 15:11:14 (UTC).

Raizel Blumberger v. California Hospital Medical Center et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2022 Raizel Blumberger filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against California Hospital Medical Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha and Jacqueline Chooljian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-06066

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

raizel blumberger

Petitioner

United States of America

Defendants

California Hospital Medical Center

Dignity Health

Ian B. Tilley

Doe 1

Doe 2

Doe 3

Doe 4

Doe 5

Doe 6

Does 7 through 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Barry Novack

Attorney at Barry Novack Law Offices

8383 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 830

Beverly Hills, CA 90211-2407

Samuel J Winokur

Attorney at Law Offices of Barry Novack

8383 Wilshire Blvd Ste 830

Beverly Hills, CA 90024

Petitioner Attorney

Ryan Casey Chapman

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

300 North Los Angeles Street Suite 7516

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Defendant Attorneys

Jacob S Rosenberg

Attorney at Law and Brandmeyer LLP

385 East Colorado Boulevard Suite 200

Pasadena, CA 91101

Kent T Brandmeyer

Attorney at Law and Brandmeyer LLP

385 East Colorado Boulevard Suite 200

Pasadena, CA 91101

Matthew S. Freedus

Attorney at Feldesman Tucker Leifer Fidell LLP

1129 - 20Th Street Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) Objection to Defendant's Evidence in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #23 filed by Plaintiff Raizel Blumberger. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Novack, Barry) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

23 #3

Proof of Service

23 #2

Proposed Order

23 #1

Exhibit 1

#23

(#27) DECLARATION of Barry Novack in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #23 filed by Plaintiff Raizel Blumberger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Proof of Service)(Novack, Barry) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

20 #3

Proof of Service

20 #2

Proposed Order

20 #1

Declaration of Ryan C. Chapman

#20

(#28) Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to the Superior Court of California for the County of Los Angeles #20 filed by Defendant Ian B. Tilley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rosenberg Declaration, #2 Declaration Proof of Service)(Freedus, Matthew) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

#6

(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ian B. Tilley. (Rosenberg, Jacob) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

#4

(#4) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

1 #3

Civil Case Registry of Actions

1 #2

Notice of Deeming Action

1 #1

Civil Case Filings

1 #1

Main Document

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING PLAINTIFF RAIZEL BLUMBERGER'S MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT (DKT. #23 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court finds that the Motion to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court currently scheduled for hearing on October 21, 2022, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, this motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. The court expects the parties to continue litigating this action diligently, while awaiting the court's ruling on this motion. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOVANT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA' MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES (DKT. #20 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court finds that the Motion to Remand Case to the Superior Court of California for the County of Los Angeles currently scheduled for hearing on October 14, 2022, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, this motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. The court expects the parties to continue litigating this action diligently, while awaiting the court's ruling on this motion. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Objection to Defendant's Evidence in Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #23 filed by Plaintiff Raizel Blumberger. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Novack, Barry) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #23 filed by Plaintiff Raizel Blumberger. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Novack, Barry) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Ian B. Tilley, re Response in Opposition to Motion #29 served on 9/30/2022. (Freedus, Matthew) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to the Superior Court of California for the County of Los Angeles #20 filed by Movant United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Chapman, Ryan) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #23 filed by Defendant Ian B. Tilley. (Freedus, Matthew) (Entered: 09/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to the Superior Court of California for the County of Los Angeles #20 filed by Defendant Ian B. Tilley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rosenberg Declaration, #2 Declaration Proof of Service)(Freedus, Matthew) (Entered: 09/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) DECLARATION of Barry Novack in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #23 filed by Plaintiff Raizel Blumberger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Proof of Service)(Novack, Barry) (Entered: 09/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Samuel J Winokur counsel for Plaintiff Raizel Blumberger. Adding Samuel J Winokur as counsel of record for Raizel Blumberger for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Raizel Blumberger. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Samuel J Winokur added to party Raizel Blumberger(pty:pla))(Winokur, Samuel) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Matthew S. Freedus to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Ian B. Tilley (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33918257) filed by Defendant Ian B. Tilley, M.D. Ian B. Tilley. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing Matthew Freedus, #2 Proposed Order Matthew Freedus Application Pro Hac Vice) (Rosenberg, Jacob) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant, Ian B. Tilley, M.D. Certification and Notice of Interested Parties CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ian B. Tilley, M.D. Ian B. Tilley, (Rosenberg, Jacob) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (hc) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Ian B. Tilley. (Rosenberg, Jacob) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants California Hospital Medical Center, Dignity Health, Doe 1, Doe 2, Doe 3, Doe 4, Doe 5, Doe 6, Does, Ian B. Tilley, filed by Plaintiff Raizel Blumberger. Filed in State Court on 5/20/2021 Submitted with Attachment Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 08/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the County of Los Angeles, case number 21STCV19115 Receipt No: ACACDC-33880953 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Ian Brent Tilley, MD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Filings, #2 Notice of Deeming Action, #3 Civil Case Registry of Actions) (Attorney Jacob S Rosenberg added to party Ian Brent Tilley, MD(pty:bkmov))(Rosenberg, Jacob) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH DBA NORTHRIDGE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTHEW S FREEDUS