This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:26:30 (UTC).

Bluford-Curry v. Ganley Ford, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Bluford-Curry filed an Other lawsuit against Ganley Ford, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sara Lioi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-02833

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara Lioi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donna Bluford-Curry

Defendant

Ganley Ford, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David B. Levin

Attorney at Law Office of Todd M. Friedman

333 Skokie Blvd.

Northbrook, IL 60062

Michael Eisenband

Attorney at Eisenband Law

515 East Las Olas Blvd.

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorneys

David D. Yeagley

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne - Cleveland

1100 Skylight Office Tower, 1660 West Second Street

Cleveland, OH 44113

Gregory C. Djordjevic

Attorney at Ulmer & Berne - Cleveland

1100 Skylight Office Tower, 1660 West Second Street

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Attorney Appearance by Michael Eisenband filed by on behalf of Donna Bluford-Curry. (Eisenband, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#7

(#7) Attorney Appearance by David D. Yeagley filed by on behalf of Ganley Ford, Inc. (Yeagley, David) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#6

(#6) Attorney Appearance by Gregory C. Djordjevic filed by on behalf of Ganley Ford, Inc. (Djordjevic, Gregory) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#5

(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Donna Bluford-Curry. Ganley Ford, Inc waiver sent on 12/9/2019, answer due 2/7/2020 filed on behalf of Donna Bluford-Curry (Levin, David) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

4 #2

Appendix B - Exhibit List

4 #1

Appendix A - Witness List

#4

(#4) Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 12/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (T,Je) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

3 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#3

(#3) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Ganley Ford, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (T,Je) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Attorney Appearance by David B. Levin filed by on behalf of Donna Bluford-Curry. (Levin, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Class Action Complaint with jury demand against Ganley Ford, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9663933.. Filed by Donna Bluford-Curry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Levin, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Attorney Appearance by Michael Eisenband filed by on behalf of Donna Bluford-Curry. (Eisenband, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Attorney Appearance by David D. Yeagley filed by on behalf of Ganley Ford, Inc. (Yeagley, David) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Attorney Appearance by Gregory C. Djordjevic filed by on behalf of Ganley Ford, Inc. (Djordjevic, Gregory) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Donna Bluford-Curry. Ganley Ford, Inc waiver sent on 12/9/2019, answer due 2/7/2020 filed on behalf of Donna Bluford-Curry (Levin, David) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 12/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List) (T,Je) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Ganley Ford, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (T,Je) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (T,Je) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (T,Je) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Attorney Appearance by David B. Levin filed by on behalf of Donna Bluford-Curry. (Levin, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Class Action Complaint with jury demand against Ganley Ford, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9663933.. Filed by Donna Bluford-Curry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Levin, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.