This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2021 at 10:27:51 (UTC).

Bluestone Partners LLC v. EHS Maryland LLC

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Bluestone Partners LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EHS Maryland LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sean D. Jordan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00286

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sean D. Jordan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Bluestone Partners LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

EHS Maryland LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Michael Cleveland Wynne

Attorney at Nall Pelley & Wynne LLP

707 W Washington, P.O. Box 2228

Sherman, TX 75091-2228

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Camilla J Hundley

Attorney at PilieroMazza PLLC

888 17Th Street Nw, 11Th Floor

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/21/2021. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 7/21/2021 at 01:00 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 5/20/2021. (mem) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EHS Maryland LLC (Hundley, Camilla) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 4/29/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

4 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Change Order 2

4 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Change Order 1

#4

(#4) AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint , CLAIM Breach of Contract, First COUNTERCLAIM against Bluestone Partners LLC by EHS Maryland LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Change Order 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Change Order 2)(Hundley, Camilla) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#3

(#3) ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Complaint by EHS Maryland LLC.(mem) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

2 #2

Exhibit 2

2 #1

Exhibit 1

#2

(#2) ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against EHS Maryland LLC, filed by Bluestone Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(mem) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Filings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from 15th District Court of Texas, case number CV-21-0051. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8347737), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet )(Hundley, Camilla) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/9/2021 with flattened pdf) (mem) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/21/2021. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 7/21/2021 at 01:00 PM in Ctrm 105 (Plano) before District Judge Sean D. Jordan. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 5/20/2021. (mem) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EHS Maryland LLC (Hundley, Camilla) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 4/29/2021. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint , CLAIM Breach of Contract, First COUNTERCLAIM against Bluestone Partners LLC by EHS Maryland LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Change Order 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Change Order 2)(Hundley, Camilla) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ***ANSWER FILED IN STATE COURT*** ANSWER to #2 Complaint by EHS Maryland LLC.(mem) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ***COMPLAINT FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against EHS Maryland LLC, filed by Bluestone Partners LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(mem) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mem, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (mem) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from 15th District Court of Texas, case number CV-21-0051. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8347737), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet )(Hundley, Camilla) (Attachment 2 replaced on 4/9/2021 with flattened pdf) (mem) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less