This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/11/2020 at 11:07:25 (UTC).

Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC v. Pandora Media, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/12/2020 Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Pandora Media, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00731

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC

Defendant

Pandora Media, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian A. Carpenter

Attorney at Carstens & Cahoon, LLP

P.O. Box 802334

Dallas, TX 75240

Tara K. Hawkes

Attorney at Sheridan Ross P.C.

1560 Broadway, Suite 1200

Denver, CO 80202

Robert R. Brunelli

Attorney at Sheridan Ross P.C.

1560 Broadway, Ste 1200

Denver, CO 80202

Paul Sung Cha

Attorney at Sheridan Ross P.C.

1560 Broadway, Suite 1200

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorney

Michael J Sacksteder

Attorney at Fenwick & West LLP

555 California Street - 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

#14

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

#11

#10

1 #52

Exhibit 35.5

1 #28

Exhibit 24

1 #27

Exhibit 23

1 #26

Exhibit 22

1 #25

Exhibit 21

1 #24

Exhibit 20

1 #23

Exhibit 19

1 #22

Exhibit 18

1 #20

Exhibit 16

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Pandora Media, LLC answer due 10/20/2020. (am) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is an agreed motion, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including October 20, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hs) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by Pandora Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness in Patent Cases (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Pandora Media, LLC answer due 10/5/2020. (mc5) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is agreed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including October 5, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, (Agreed Motion for An Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint) by Pandora Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sacksteder, Michael) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 08/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 08/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 08/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brian A. Carpenter for Paul Sung Cha ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13909193) by on behalf of Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Carpenter, Brian) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. Pandora Media, LLC served on 8/14/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Carpenter, Brian) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Pandora Media, LLC. (am) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Carpenter, Brian) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Pursuant to the Standing Order Regarding Patent/Trademark Cases effective December 9, 2019, attorneys filing Patent/Trademark cases in TXWD Waco division must prepare the attached form AO-120 and e-file using the "Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form" event upon opening of the case. (am) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRemark: Doc. #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Doc. #2 was not flattened. Please notice that all documents are required to be flattened upon filing. The U.S. Clerk's Office will flatten any document needed prior, but all parties MUST flatten documents going forward. Contact the Clerk's Office for any questions. (am) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Parties by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Carpenter, Brian) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Carpenter, Brian) (Main Document 2 replaced on 8/13/2020) (am). (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13857400), filed by Bluebonnet Internet Media Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8 Part 1, #10 Exhibit 8 Part 2, #11 Exhibit 9 Part 1, #12 Exhibit 9 Part 2, #13 Exhibit 10 Part 1, #14 Exhibit 10 Part 2, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 25, #30 Exhibit 26, #31 Exhibit 27, #32 Exhibit 28, #33 Exhibit 29, #34 Exhibit 30, #35 Exhibit 31, #36 Exhibit 32, #37 Exhibit 33, #38 Exhibit 34 Part 1, #39 Exhibit 34 Part 2, #40 Exhibit 34 Part 3, #41 Exhibit 34 Part 4, #42 Exhibit 34 Part 5, #43 Exhibit 34 Part 6, #44 Exhibit 35 Part 1, #45 Exhibit 35 Part 2, #46 Exhibit 35 Part 3, #47 Exhibit 35 Part 4, #48 Exhibit 35.1, #49 Exhibit 35.2, #50 Exhibit 35.3, #51 Exhibit 35.4, #52 Exhibit 35.5, #53 Exhibit 35.6, #54 Exhibit 36 Part 1, #55 Exhibit 36 Part 2, #56 Exhibit 36 Part 3, #57 Exhibit 36 Part 4, #58 Exhibit 36 Part 5, #59 Exhibit 36 Part 6, #60 Exhibit 37 Part 1, #61 Exhibit 37 Part 2, #62 Exhibit 38 Part 1, #63 Exhibit 38 Part 2, #64 Exhibit 38 Part 3, #65 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carpenter, Brian) (Attachment 65 replaced on 8/13/2020) (am). (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pandora Media, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tara Kayleen Hawkes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul S Chan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert R. Brunelli