This case was last updated from PACER on 09/11/2020 at 13:56:20 (UTC).

Blue v. Textron, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/13/2020 Blue filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Textron, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. Randal Hall and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00099

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Randal Hall

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Unjoo Blue

Defendant

Textron, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Heather K. Karrh

Attorney at Rogers, Hofrichter & Karrh, LLC

225 S. Glynn Street, Suite A

Fayetteville, GA 30214

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 8/13/2020. (ca) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Unjoo Blue (Karrh, Heather) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Settlement by Unjoo Blue (Karrh, Heather) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#4

(#4) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Unjoo Blue. (Karrh, Heather) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

2 #1

Blank Civil Case Forms

#2

(#2) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Blank Civil Case Forms.) (jlh) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Textron, Inc., filed by Unjoo Blue. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 8/13/2020. (ca) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Unjoo Blue (Karrh, Heather) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Settlement by Unjoo Blue (Karrh, Heather) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Litigants' Bill of Rights by Unjoo Blue. (Karrh, Heather) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 07/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Blank Civil Case Forms.) (jlh) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400.00, receipt number AGASDC-2879722. (jlh) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Textron, Inc., filed by Unjoo Blue. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet.) (jlh) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less