This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2023 at 07:49:52 (UTC).

Blue v. American National Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/07/2022 Blue filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against American National Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Frank Montalvo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00414

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank Montalvo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elizabeth Blue

Defendant

American National Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Robert Anderson

Attorney at Chavez Law Firm

2101 Stanton Street

El Paso, TX 79902

Enrique Chavez, Jr.

Attorney at Chavez Law Firm

2101 N. Stanton St.

El Paso, TX 79902

Defendant Attorneys

Bruce A. Koehler

Attorney at Mounce, Green, Myers, Safi, Paxson & Galatzan, P.C.

P.O. Box 1977

El Paso, TX 79950-1977

Joseph R. Russo, Jr.

Attorney at Greer, Herz & Adams, L.L.P.

One Moody Plaza, 18Th Floor

Galveston, TX 77550

Roni S. Mihaly

Attorney at Greer, Herz & Adams, LLP

2525 South Shore Blvd., Suite 203

League City, TX 77573

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit All process, pleadings, and orders

1 #2

Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Supplement JS-44 Supplement

#2

(#2) Pro Hac Vice Letter. (jg1) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

#3

(#3) Defendant's Original ANSWER to Complaint by American National Insurance Company.(Koehler, Bruce) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#4

(#4) Order for Proposed Scheduling Order. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/12/2022,. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (dt) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by American National Insurance Company (Koehler, Bruce) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#6

(#6) Proposed Order Scheduling to #4 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by American National Insurance Company. (Koehler, Bruce) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 1/11/2023, Jury Selection set for 8/21/2023 01:00PM before Judge Frank Montalvo, Jury Trial set for 8/21/2023 01:00 PM before Judge Frank Montalvo, ADR Report Deadline due by 5/26/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 1/23/2023, Discovery due by 5/12/2023, Motions due by 6/26/2023,. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 1/11/2023, Jury Selection set for 8/21/2023 01:00PM before Judge Frank Montalvo, Jury Trial set for 8/21/2023 01:00 PM before Judge Frank Montalvo, ADR Report Deadline due by 5/26/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 1/23/2023, Discovery due by 5/12/2023, Motions due by 6/26/2023,. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (jg1) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Order Scheduling to #4 Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by American National Insurance Company. (Koehler, Bruce) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by American National Insurance Company (Koehler, Bruce) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order for Proposed Scheduling Order. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/12/2022,. Signed by Judge Frank Montalvo. (dt) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Defendant's Original ANSWER to Complaint by American National Insurance Company.(Koehler, Bruce) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Pro Hac Vice Letter. (jg1) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (jg1) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Frank Montalvo. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jg1) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American National Insurance Company (Filing fee $402 receipt number BTXWDC-16725903), filed by American National Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit All process, pleadings, and orders, #2 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement JS-44 Supplement)(Koehler, Bruce) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce A. Koehler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph R. Russo Jr.