This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/20/2023 at 07:45:25 (UTC).

Blue Spring Partners, LLC v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A to the Complaint

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 Blue Spring Partners, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A to the Complaint. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Martha M. Pacold. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-06513

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martha M. Pacold

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blue Spring Partners, LLC

Defendants

The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A to the Complaint

C-Sports

Lotiang

Hulaha

PURFEL

Familycrazy

Garlagy

Fishtailfun Group

Aukidwld INC

Youniliyu

Superband

Punk and Rock

Lovely Mermaid (Juliseeme)

Choadam

fangwenlt

Surejoymall

exoman

global cosplay

Moonlight clothing store

40 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anna Iskikian

Attorney at Thoits Law

400 Main St, 250

Los Altos, CA 94022

David Edward Hutchinson

Attorney at Thoits Law

1136 S. Delano Court West, Ste B201, 2068

Chicago, IL 60605

Defendant Attorney

Adam Edward Urbanczyk

Attorney at Au LLC

564 W. Ranolph St., Ste 2Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60661

Other Attorneys

Lydia Pittaway

Attorney at Pittaway Law Pllc

133 S 2Nd St Ste 101

Ft. Pierce, FL 34950

Michael Thomas Stanley

Attorney at Michael Stanley and Associates, P.C.

5455 N Sheridan Rd, Unit 503

Chicago, IL 60640

 

Court Documents

#50

(#50) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: As to joinder: By 4:00 p.m. on 1/25/2023, plaintiff and each set of appearing defendants should file simultaneous briefs (limited to 5 pages, excluding caption and signature block) addressing whether joinder of all defendants in a single case remains appropriate. The complaint alleged that "The Defendant Internet Stores share unique identifiers, such as design elements and similarities of the counterfeit products offered for sale, establishing a logical relationship between them and suggesting that Defendants' illegal operations arise out of the same transaction, occurrence, or series of transactions or occurrences." Complaint, #1 , paragraph 2. However, two separate sets of defendants (totaling 58 of 170 original defendants) have appeared and are litigating the case on separate schedules (in terms of responding to the preliminary injunction motion and answering the complaint), raising the possibility that this case could effectively become multiple cases litigated by separate defendants on separate tracks, all under a single case number, creating inefficiency and confusion on the docket. In light of that possibility, the parties' briefs should address whether, under Fed. R. Civ. P. 20 and 21 (and any other relevant authority), one or more defendant(s) or set(s) of defendants should be severed into a separate case, in which plaintiff would pay the filing fee and then the case would proceed. (rao, ) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

#49

(#49) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: As to the Aixuanyu Costume Store Defendants: Certain Defendants (the "Aixuanyu Costume Store Defendants") filed a response, #32 , to the motion for entry of a preliminary injunction, #21 . Plaintiff has until 1/30/2023 to file its reply. (rao, ) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

32 #1

Exhibit 1

32 #32

Main Document

21 #1

Supplement Memo in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction

21 #21

Main Document

9 #7

Exhibit Ex. 5 to Attorney Declaration - Hague Convention on Service Abroad

9 #5

Exhibit Ex. 3 to Attorney Declaration - BASCAP Report

9 #4

Exhibit Ex. 2 to Attorney Declaration - 2020 IP Rights Seizures Stat Report

6 #1

Supplement Schedule A to AO 121 form

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Blue Spring Partners, LLC (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Blue Spring Partners, LLC by David Edward Hutchinson (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit Ex. 2 Provisionally Filed Under Seal - Schedule A slip sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Ex. 1 Fin Fun Copyright Registrations

1 #1

Main Document

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: As to joinder: By 4:00 p.m. on 1/25/2023, plaintiff and each set of appearing defendants should file simultaneous briefs (limited to 5 pages, excluding caption and signature block) addressing whether joinder of all defendants in a single case remains appropriate. The complaint alleged that "The Defendant Internet Stores share unique identifiers, such as design elements and similarities of the counterfeit products offered for sale, establishing a logical relationship between them and suggesting that Defendants' illegal operations arise out of the same transaction, occurrence, or series of transactions or occurrences." Complaint, #1 , paragraph 2. However, two separate sets of defendants (totaling 58 of 170 original defendants) have appeared and are litigating the case on separate schedules (in terms of responding to the preliminary injunction motion and answering the complaint), raising the possibility that this case could effectively become multiple cases litigated by separate defendants on separate tracks, all under a single case number, creating inefficiency and confusion on the docket. In light of that possibility, the parties' briefs should address whether, under Fed. R. Civ. P. 20 and 21 (and any other relevant authority), one or more defendant(s) or set(s) of defendants should be severed into a separate case, in which plaintiff would pay the filing fee and then the case would proceed. (rao, ) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: As to the Aixuanyu Costume Store Defendants: Certain Defendants (the "Aixuanyu Costume Store Defendants") filed a response, #32 , to the motion for entry of a preliminary injunction, #21 . Plaintiff has until 1/30/2023 to file its reply. (rao, ) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: As to the BigOrder Defendants: The BigOrder Defendants' unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint #40 is granted. These defendants have until 2/21/2023 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. (rao, ) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: As to the BigOrder Defendants: Certain defendants (the "BigOrder Defendants") filed a notice of compliance #44 . The notice addresses the court's order regarding compliance with Local Rule 83.15 #39 . (rao, ) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: As to nonobjecting defendants: By 1/25/2023, plaintiff should send to the proposed order box an updated proposed preliminary injunction order and accompanying Schedule A that clearly exempts both the objecting defendants and all defendants that have settled, both in the text of the proposed order and on the accompanying Schedule A. (rao, ) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: As to settling defendants: Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend the pleadings under Rule 15(a)(2) #41 is granted. Plaintiff has filed an amended Schedule A on the docket #42 . Defendants No. 49 Creamcake, No. 64 hengshuai, No. 68 Jasmey, No. 70 Kiminging, No. 73 LLH store, and No. 96 XFVSDXS terminated. (rao, ) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Notice of Compliance by (120) BigOrder, (122) Caitzr, (123) DGMTY, (127) guangzhouzhongyingdianzishangwuyouxiangongsi, (128) haoshengqiyue, (133) minggong, (134) Moning, (138) Shanghai Leiyuan Energy Technology Co., Ltd., (139) Shenzhen Dali Industry Co., Ltd., (142) Shenzhen Weitian Industrial Co., Ltd., (143) shenzhenshi shenghuashuo dianzishangwu youxiangongsi, (145) shenzhenshijiahuoyuandianzishangwuyouxiangongsi, (147) shenzhenshishilongwangluokejiyouxiangongsi, (148) sigeshangmao, (149) sike, (150) Store shopping, (151) suyue, (152) Sweeky, (154) VASTSEE, (155) Venkuber, (156) yuanhuisheng, (157) yuehongyang (Pittaway, Lydia) (Entered: 01/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants (120) BigOrder, (122) Caitzr, (123) DGMTY, (127) guangzhouzhongyingdianzishangwuyouxiangongsi, (128) haoshengqiyue, (133) minggong, (134) Moning, (138) Shanghai Leiyuan Energy Technology Co., Ltd., (139) Shenzhen Dali Industry Co., Ltd., (142) Shenzhen Weitian Industrial Co., Ltd., (143) shenzhenshi shenghuashuo dianzishangwu youxiangongsi, (145) shenzhenshijiahuoyuandianzishangwuyouxiangongsi, (147) shenzhenshishilongwangluokejiyouxiangongsi, (148) sigeshangmao, (149) sike, (150) Store shopping, (151) suyue, (152) Sweeky, (154) VASTSEE, (155) Venkuber, (156) yuanhuisheng, (157) yuehongyang by Michael Thomas Stanley (Stanley, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) AMENDED Second Amended Schedule A to the Complaint Instanter. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MOTION by Plaintiff Blue Spring Partners, LLC to amend/correct Schedule A to the Complaint Instanter. (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Blue Spring Partners, LLC Ex. 2 (Parts 1-22) of Declaration of Eric Browning. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 2 (2 of 22) of Eric Browning Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 (3 of 22) of Eric Browning Declaration, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 (4 of 22) of Eric Browning Declaration, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2 (5 of 22) of Declaration of Eric Browning, #5 Exhibit Ex. 2 (6 of 22) of Declaration of Eric Browning, #6 Exhibit Ex. 2 (7 of 22) of Declaration of Eric Browning, #7 Errata Ex. 2 (8 of 22) of Declaration of Eric Browning, #8 Exhibit Ex. 2 (9 of 22) of Declaration of Eric Browning, #9 Exhibit Ex. 2 (10 of 22) of Declaration of Eric Browning, #10 Exhibit Ex. 2 (11 of 22) of Declaration of Eric Browning, #11 Exhibit Ex. 2 (12 of 22) of Declaration of Eric Browning, #12 Exhibit Ex. 2 (13 of 22) of Declaration of Eric Browning, #13 Exhibit Ex. 2 (14 of 22) of Declaration of Eric Browning, #14 Exhibit Ex. 2 (15 of 22) of Declaration of Eric Browning, #15 Exhibit Ex. 2 (16 of 22) of Declaration of Eric Browning, #16 Exhibit Ex. 2 (17 of 22) of Declaration of Eric Browning, #17 Exhibit Ex. 2 (18 of 22) of Declaration of Eric Browning, #18 Exhibit Ex. 2 (19 of 22) of Declaration of Eric Browning, #19 Exhibit Ex. 2 (20 of 22) of Declaration of Eric Browning, #20 Exhibit Ex. 2 (21 of 22) of Declaration of Eric Browning, #21 Exhibit Ex. 2 (22 of 22) of Declaration of Eric Browning)(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION by Plaintiff Blue Spring Partners, LLC for leave to file excess pages for memo in support of Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in support of Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Declaration Attorney Declaration (David E. Hutchinson) in support of Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Attorney Declaration - Jan 2011 Mark Monitor, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Attorney Declaration - 2020 IP Rights Seizures Stat Report, #5 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Attorney Declaration - BASCAP Report, #6 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Attorney Declaration - ICANN Registrar Accreditation Agreement, #7 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Attorney Declaration - Hague Convention on Service Abroad, #8 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Attorney Declaration - Translation of Civil Procedure Law of the People of China, #9 Declaration Declaration of Eric Browning (Client), #10 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Declaration of Eric Browning (Fin Fun Copyright Registrations))(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (mbh, ) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mbh, ) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CLAIM by Blue Spring Partners, LLC regarding complaint, #1 of Copyright infringements. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Schedule A to AO 121 form)(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Blue Spring Partners, LLC (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Blue Spring Partners, LLC Schedule A to the Complaint (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Blue Spring Partners, LLC by David Edward Hutchinson (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Blue Spring Partners, LLC; Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-20067191. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Fin Fun Copyright Registrations, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Provisionally Filed Under Seal - Schedule A slip sheet)(Hutchinson, David) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less