This case was last updated from PACER on 07/18/2019 at 07:05:05 (UTC).

Blue Spring Partners, LLC v. Amazon Seller YITU2019

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Blue Spring Partners, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Amazon Seller YITU2019. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is Candy W. Dale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00181

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Candy W. Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Blue Spring Partner, LLC

Amazon Seller YITU2019 aka Jerry Zhang and Wenjie Zhang

Blue Spring Partners, LLC

Defendants

Amazon Seller YITU2019

Jerry Zhang

Wenjie Zhang

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradlee R Frazer

Attorney at Hawley Troxell Ennis & Hawley

877 Main Street, Suite 1000, P. O. Box 1617

Boise, ID 83701-1617

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all parties who have not entered an appearance via PACER to date. Within thirty days of the filing of the Complaint, the Plaintiff must file with the Court a status report regarding service of the summons and complaint. Unless the Plaintiff contacts Courtroom Deputy, Amy Tate, and requests adifferent date and time, the Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on July 30, 2019, at 9:30 AM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before July 23, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint LitigationPlan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (km)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Spring Partners, LLC. (Frazer, Bradlee)

2 #1

Complaint

#2

(#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s)VA 2-034-596 (Notice sent to USPTO) (km) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/5/2019: #1 Complaint) (km).

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against Amazon Seller YITU2019 aka Jerry Zhang and Wenjie Zhang ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1890001.), filed by Blue Spring Partner, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Frazer, Bradlee) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/4/2019 with PDF that can't be edited) (km).

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • (#5) AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 7/30/2019 09:30 AM is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 7/31/2019 10:30 AM Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the conference call and when all parties are on the line, connect to the courtroom at 208-334-9945. Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans to be filed on or before 7/24/2019. (at)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all parties who have not entered an appearance via PACER to date. Within thirty days of the filing of the Complaint, the Plaintiff must file with the Court a status report regarding service of the summons and complaint. Unless the Plaintiff contacts Courtroom Deputy, Amy Tate, and requests adifferent date and time, the Court will conduct a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on July 30, 2019, at 9:30 AM mountain time, for purpose of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before July 23, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint LitigationPlan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (km)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blue Spring Partners, LLC. (Frazer, Bradlee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (km)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s)VA 2-034-596 (Notice sent to USPTO) (km) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/5/2019: #1 Complaint) (km).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Eastern Division. Please use case number 4:19-cv-181-CWD for all future filings. (km)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against Amazon Seller YITU2019 aka Jerry Zhang and Wenjie Zhang ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1890001.), filed by Blue Spring Partner, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Frazer, Bradlee) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/4/2019 with PDF that can't be edited) (km).

    Read MoreRead Less