This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2023 at 08:09:29 (UTC).

BLUE SEAS FRESH FISH, LLC v. Great American Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 BLUE SEAS FRESH FISH, LLC filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Great American Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Raag Singhal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:23-CV-60352

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raag Singhal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLUE SEAS FRESH FISH, LLC

Defendants

Great American Insurance Company

GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Nicholas Adams

Defendant Attorney

Daniel C Shatz

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet

1 #2

Summon(s) Summons

1 #3

Exhibit All Exhibits

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Great American Insurance Company. (rbe) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#7

(#7) Civil Complaint Cover Sheet by United States Attorney (Adams, Matthew) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Great American Insurance Company. Response/Answer due 5/2/2023. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/13/2023. (pb00) (Entered: 04/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Great American Insurance Company. Attorney Daniel C Shatz added to party Great American Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Shatz, Daniel) (Entered: 04/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Civil Complaint Cover Sheet by United States Attorney (Adams, Matthew) (Entered: 03/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2023
  • Docket(#6) PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONSWithin SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges as interested parties unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/25/2023. (pb00) (Entered: 02/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2023
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions (and responses to motions) with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions (and responses).Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Courts CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket EntryA party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/25/2023. (pb00) (Entered: 02/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • Docket(#4) Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (rbe) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Great American Insurance Company. (rbe) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Great American Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16359955, filed by BLUE SEAS FRESH FISH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons, #3 Exhibit All Exhibits)(Adams, Matthew) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less