Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/09/2021 at 10:24:37 (UTC).

Blue River Communications, Inc. v. The Burlington Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 Blue River Communications, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against The Burlington Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles Eskridge. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00418

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles Eskridge

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blue River Communications, Inc.

Defendant

The Burlington Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher M Cammack

Attorney at Attorney at Law

7324 Southwest Freeway, Ste 1466

Houston, TX 77074

Defendant Attorneys

William Lance Lewis

Attorney at Quilling Selander et al

2001 Bryan St, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Marcie L Schout

Attorney at Quilling, Selander, Lownds, Winslett & Moser, P.C.

2001 Bryan St, Ste 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: The Court held the Initial Conference on March 31, 2021. The Court admonished the parties to review and strictly adhere to Judge Eskridges procedures. The Court GRANTED #9 Plaintiffs motion to amend complaint. Appearances: Christopher M Cammack, Marcie L Schout. Ct Reporter: Kathy Miller. Digital Number: 9:44-9:48AM.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#11

(#11) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Burlington Insurance Company filed by Blue River Communications, Inc..(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Amend.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

9 #2

Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiff Leave to File Amended Complaint

9 #1

Exhibit Plaintiff Exhibit 1

#9

(#9) MOTION to Amend by Blue River Communications, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiff Leave to File Amended Complaint)(Cammack, Christopher) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by The Burlington Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schout, Marcie) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Blue River Communications, LLC, filed.(Cammack, Christopher) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 06/02/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 04/30/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 11/30/2021. Deft Expert Report due by 01/05/2021. Discovery due by 03/23/2022. Mediation due by 05/10/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 03/25/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 03/25/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 06/09/2022. Docket Call set for 07/18/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jengonzalezadi) (Entered: 2/25/2021) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#5

(#5) Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Burlington Insurance Company, filed.(Schout, Marcie) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/31/2021 at 09:45 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Burlington Insurance Company identifying International Financial Group, Incorporated as Corporate Parent, filed.(Schout, Marcie) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 133rd Judicial District Court of Harris County, case number 2021-01108 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25933783) filed by The Burlington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, William) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ENTRY ORDER: The Court held the Initial Conference on March 31, 2021. The Court admonished the parties to review and strictly adhere to Judge Eskridges procedures. The Court GRANTED #9 Plaintiffs motion to amend complaint. Appearances: Christopher M Cammack, Marcie L Schout. Ct Reporter: Kathy Miller. Digital Number: 9:44-9:48AM.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon) Parties notified.(sjones, 4) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Burlington Insurance Company filed by Blue River Communications, Inc..(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Amend.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Amend by Blue River Communications, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiff Leave to File Amended Complaint)(Cammack, Christopher) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by The Burlington Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schout, Marcie) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Blue River Communications, LLC, filed.(Cammack, Christopher) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING and DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 06/02/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 04/30/2021. Plaintiff Expert Report due by 11/30/2021. Deft Expert Report due by 01/05/2021. Discovery due by 03/23/2022. Mediation due by 05/10/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 03/25/2022. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 03/25/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 06/09/2022. Docket Call set for 07/18/2022 at 9:30 AM before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified. (jengonzalezadi) (Entered: 2/25/2021) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Amended CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Burlington Insurance Company, filed.(Schout, Marcie) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by The Burlington Insurance Company, filed.(Schout, Marcie) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/31/2021 at 09:45 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Sam S Sheldon. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Burlington Insurance Company identifying International Financial Group, Incorporated as Corporate Parent, filed.(Schout, Marcie) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 133rd Judicial District Court of Harris County, case number 2021-01108 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25933783) filed by The Burlington Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, William) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Burlington Ins Co (The) is a litigant