This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/26/2022 at 07:27:43 (UTC).

Blue Marlin Oilfield & Equipment Rentals, Inc., et al v. Certain Underwriters at LLoyd's London, et al

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 Blue Marlin Oilfield Equipment Rentals, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Certain Underwriters at LLoyd's London. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jay C. Zainey and Dana Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02389

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay C. Zainey

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Blue Marlin Oilfield & Equipment Rentals, Inc.

Dove Development & Land Rentals, LLC

Dove Development & Land, LLC

Dove Land Corporation

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Certain Underwriters LLoyd's London

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

QBE Specialty Insurance Company

Steadfast Insurance Company

General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona

United Specialty Insurance Company

Lexington Insurance Company

HDI Global Specialty SE

Old Republic Union Insurance Company

GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company

transverse specialty insurance company

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Sye J. Broussard

Attorney at Broussard & Dove, APLC

7605 Park Avenue

Houma, LA 70364

Jackie Dove Broussard

Attorney at Broussard & Dove, APLC

7605 Park Avenue

Houma, LA 70364

Victor M. Dantin

Attorney at Broussard & Dove, APLC

7605 Park Ave

Houma, LA 70364

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

D. Russell Holwadel

Attorney at Adams, Hoefer, Holwadel, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr.

Attorney at Adams, Hoefer, Holwadel, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Heather England Reznik

Attorney at Adams, Hoefer, Holwadel, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Kyle M. Truxillo

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Ste 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Phillip J. Rew

Attorney at Adams, Hoefer, Holwadel, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

Richard R. Stedman, II

Attorney at Adams Hoefer Holwadel, LLC

400 Poydras Street, Ste 2450

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Dove Land Corporation (Broussard, Sye) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#26

(#26) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Dove Development & Land Rentals, LLC (Broussard, Sye) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#25

(#25) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Dove Development & Land, LLC (Broussard, Sye) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#24

(#24) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Blue Marlin Oilfield & Equipment Rentals, Inc. (Broussard, Sye) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

23 #4

Exhibit 3 - Settlement of Claims Clause

23 #3

Exhibit 2 - Arbitration Clause

23 #2

Exhibit 1 - Policy

23 #1

Memorandum in Support

23 #23

Main Document

3 #8

Summons

3 #7

Summons

3 #6

Summons

3 #5

Summons

3 #1

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet JS-44

1 #1

Affidavit Verifications

#1

(#22) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Transverse Specialty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, United Specialty Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party HDI Global Specialty SE(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party Indian Harbor Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party Lexington Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party Old Republic Union Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party QBE Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party Steadfast Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party Transverse Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party United Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Hoefer, Bruce) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Dove Land Corporation (Broussard, Sye) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Dove Development & Land Rentals, LLC (Broussard, Sye) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Dove Development & Land, LLC (Broussard, Sye) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Blue Marlin Oilfield & Equipment Rentals, Inc. (Broussard, Sye) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Transverse Specialty Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 3/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #3 Exhibit 2 - Arbitration Clause, #4 Exhibit 3 - Settlement of Claims Clause, #5 Notice of Submission, #6 Proposed Order)(Hoefer, Bruce) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Transverse Specialty Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, HDI Global Specialty SE, GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, United Specialty Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party HDI Global Specialty SE(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party Indian Harbor Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party Lexington Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party Old Republic Union Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party QBE Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party Steadfast Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party Transverse Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Bruce Reginald Hoefer, Jr added to party United Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Hoefer, Bruce) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SUMMONS Returned Executed; United Specialty Insurance Company served on 1/7/2022, answer due 1/28/2022. (Broussard, Sye) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Steadfast Insurance Company served on 1/7/2022, answer due 1/28/2022. (Broussard, Sye) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SUMMONS Returned Executed; QBE Specialty Insurance Company served on 1/7/2022, answer due 1/28/2022. (Broussard, Sye) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Old Republic Union Insurance Company served on 1/7/2022, answer due 1/28/2022. (Broussard, Sye) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEFICIENT: AFFIDAVIT of Service by Herbert Battistella of Summons & Complaint served on Steadfast Insurance Company on 01/07/2022. (Broussard, Sye) Modified on 1/18/2022 (cg). (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DEFICIENT: AFFIDAVIT of Service by Herbert Battistella of Summons & Complaint served on Old Republic Union Insurance Company on 01/07/2022. (Broussard, Sye) Modified on 1/18/2022 (cg). (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DEFICIENT: AFFIDAVIT of Service by Herbert Battistella of Summons & Complaint served on Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London on 01/07/2022. (Broussard, Sye) Modified on 1/18/2022 (cg). (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEFICIENT: AFFIDAVIT of Service by Herbert Battistella of Summons & Complaint served on Lexington Insurance Company on 01/07/2022. (Broussard, Sye) Modified on 1/18/2022 (cg). (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEFICIENT: AFFIDAVIT of Service by Herbert Battistella of Summons & Complaint served on Indian Harbor Insurance Company on 01/07/2022. (Broussard, Sye) Modified on 1/18/2022 (cg). (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEFICIENT: AFFIDAVIT of Service by Herbert Battistella of Summons & Complaint served on HDI Global Specialty SE on 01/07/2022. (Broussard, Sye) Modified on 1/18/2022 (cg). (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not select Dove Development & Land Rentals, LLC, Dove Development & Land, LLC, Dove Land Corporation as filers. Clerk added filer(s).** (mm) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, General Security Indemnity Company of Arizona, GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company, HDI Global Specialty SE, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Old Republic Union Insurance Company, QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Transverse Specialty Insurance Company, United Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(mm) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9161538) filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Verifications, #2 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44, #3 Summons) Attorney Sye J. Broussard added to party Blue Marlin Oilfield & Equipment Rentals, Inc.(pty:pla).(Broussard, Sye) Modified filers on 12/30/2021 (mm). (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dove Development & Land Rentals, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC UNION INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where GENERAL SECURITY AND INDEMNITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Steadfast Insurance Company aso H & M Hennes & Ma is a litigant