This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/27/2020 at 11:43:32 (UTC).

Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association v. UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2020 Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Katherine M. Menendez and Susan Richard Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-01035

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

Presiding Judge

Susan Richard Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association

Defendants

Health Plan of Nevada, Inc.

UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan G Carlson

Attorney at Carlson Caspers Vandenburgh Lindquist & Schuman PA

225 S 6Th St Ste 4200

Mpls, MN 55402

J Derek Vandenburgh

Attorney at Carlson, Caspers, Vandenburgh & Lindquist PA

225 South 6Th Street, Suite 4200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Nathan Louwagie

225 South Sixth Street, Suite 4200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Janie L. Thompson

Attorney at Hanson Bridgett LLP

425 Market Street, Ste 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Neema Sam Ghiasi

Attorney at Hanson Bridgett LLP

425 Market St 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Noel M. Cook

Attorney at Hanson Bridgett LLP

425 Market Street, Ste 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94502

Garner K. Weng

Attorney at Hanson Bridgett LLP

425 Market Street, Ste 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. Health Plan of Nevada, Inc. waiver sent on 5/28/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Weng, Garner) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated waiver sent on 5/28/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Weng, Garner) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Neema S. Ghiasi. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7706893 filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Louwagie, Nathan) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Noel M. Cook. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7706881 filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Louwagie, Nathan) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Janie L. Thompson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7706863 filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Louwagie, Nathan) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Garner K. Weng. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7706826 filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Louwagie, Nathan) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Health Plan of Nevada, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated. (kt) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#3

(#3) REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Carlson, Alan) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Carlson, Alan) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Health Plan of Nevada, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7680651) filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carlson, Alan) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. Health Plan of Nevada, Inc. waiver sent on 5/28/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Weng, Garner) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated waiver sent on 5/28/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Weng, Garner) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Garner K. Weng for Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Janie L. Thompson for Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Noel M. Cook for Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Neema Sam Ghiasi for Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. Approved by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 5/11/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Neema S. Ghiasi. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7706893 filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Louwagie, Nathan) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Noel M. Cook. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7706881 filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Louwagie, Nathan) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Janie L. Thompson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7706863 filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Louwagie, Nathan) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Garner K. Weng. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7706826 filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Louwagie, Nathan) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Health Plan of Nevada, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated. (kt) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Trademark list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-1035 SRN/KMM. (kt) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Garner K. Weng, JAnie L. Thompson, Noel M. Cook, Neema S. Ghiasi as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms#. (kt) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT ON FILING OF PATENT/TRADEMARK ACTION (AO 120)(USPTO noticed with filing). (Carlson, Alan) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. (Carlson, Alan) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Health Plan of Nevada, Inc., UnitedHealth Group, Incorporated (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7680651) filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Carlson, Alan) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEALTH PLAN OF NEVADA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITEDHEALTH GROUP INC. DBA OPTUM is a litigant

Latest cases where Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Minnesota is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Noel Matthew Cook