Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/07/2019 at 07:53:54 (UTC).

Blount v. Ingram

Case Summary

On 08/08/2019 Blount filed an Other lawsuit against Ingram. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Louise Wood Flanagan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00347

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Louise Wood Flanagan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gladys Blount

Fayetteville, NC 28314

Defendant

Samantha Jones Ingram

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Neal Fowler

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office - EDNC

150 Fayetteville Street, Suite 2100

Raleigh, NC 27601

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER denying #10 Plaintiff's Consolidated Motion for No-Contact Order for Stalking Misconduct Protecting Plaintiff DOD(EA) Whistle Blower Blount and Notice of Appearance of Plaintiff DOD(EA) Whistle Blower Blount for Case Already in Session Before Eastern District Court. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/26/2019. (Pro se party has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina.) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

17 #2

Plaintiff's Exhibit 6.1

#17

(#17) PLAINTIFF'S DISABUSE OF DEFENDANTS MOTIONS & NON-PRIMARY SOURCES PLACED IN PLAINTIFF'S RECORD BY DEFENDANT BETWEEN THE DATES OF SEPTEMBER 19, 2019 FOR PLAINTIFF DOD(EA) WHISTLE BLOWER BLOUNT FOR CASE ALREADY IN SESSION BEFORE EASTERN DISTRICT COURT regarding #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION to Remand filed by Gladys Blount. (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Plaintiff's Exhibit 6.1, #3 Emails 1-25-11, #4 Exhibit Center for Public Integrity Media Query, #5 Envelope) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

10 #5

Envelope

10 #4

Exhibit DoD IG Report

10 #3

Exhibit Email chain

10 #2

Exhibit Beaufort Gazette article

10 #1

Exhibit Civil Summons no contact order

#10

(#16) RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Remand filed by Samantha Jones Ingram. (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Samantha Jones Ingram answer due 9/16/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/13/2019. (A certified copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Gladys Blount, 8229 Frenchorn Lane, Fayetteville, NC 28314.) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#4

(#4) Notice filed by Samantha Jones Ingram (Letter to Cumberland County Clerk of Court dated August 8, 2019). (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to file a Notice of Self Representation sent to Pro Se Plaintiff Gladys Blount at 8229 Frenchorn Lane, Fayetteville, NC 28314 mailed via US mail on August 9, 2019. A copy of notice along with a blank notice of self representation and a blank financial disclosure statement. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Neal Fowler on behalf of Samantha Jones Ingram. (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

1 #3

Supplement Supplemental Cover Removal Coversheet

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, Order for Samantha Jones Ingram

#1

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Samantha Jones Ingram answer due 9/16/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/13/2019. (A certified copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Gladys Blount, 8229 Frenchorn Lane, Fayetteville, NC 28314.) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER denying #10 Plaintiff's Consolidated Motion for No-Contact Order for Stalking Misconduct Protecting Plaintiff DOD(EA) Whistle Blower Blount and Notice of Appearance of Plaintiff DOD(EA) Whistle Blower Blount for Case Already in Session Before Eastern District Court. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/26/2019. (Pro se party has consented to receiving electronic service of all motions, notices, orders, and documents in civil cases in the Eastern District of North Carolina.) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #17 PLAINTIFF'S DISABUSE OF DEFENDANTS MOTIONS & NON-PRIMARY SOURCES PLACED IN PLAINTIFF'S RECORD BY DEFENDANT BETWEEN THE DATES OF SEPTEMBER 19, 2019 FOR PLAINTIFF DOD(EA) WHISTLE BLOWER BLOUNT FOR CASE ALREADY IN SESSION BEFORE EASTERN DISTRICT COURT filed by Samantha Jones Ingram. (Fowler, Neal) Modified on 9/24/2019 to clarify docket text. (Tripp, S.). (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #11 Plaintiff's Disabuse of Notice of Correction Action Dated August 27, 2019 of Plaintiff DOD(EA) Whistle Blower Blount for Case Already In Session Before Eastern District Court filed by Samantha Jones Ingram. (Fowler, Neal) Modified on 9/24/2019 to clarify docket text. (Tripp, S.). (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #10 Plaintiff's Consolidated Motion for No-Contact Order for Stalking Misconduct Protecting Plaintiff DOD(EA) Whistle Blower Blount and Notice of Appearance of Plaintiff DOD(EA) Whistle Blower Blount for Case Already in Session Before Eastern District Court. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) PLAINTIFF'S DISABUSE OF DEFENDANTS MOTIONS & NON-PRIMARY SOURCES PLACED IN PLAINTIFF'S RECORD BY DEFENDANT BETWEEN THE DATES OF SEPTEMBER 19, 2019 FOR PLAINTIFF DOD(EA) WHISTLE BLOWER BLOUNT FOR CASE ALREADY IN SESSION BEFORE EASTERN DISTRICT COURT regarding #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION to Remand filed by Gladys Blount. (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Plaintiff's Exhibit 6.1, #3 Emails 1-25-11, #4 Exhibit Center for Public Integrity Media Query, #5 Envelope) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Remand filed by Samantha Jones Ingram. (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Rule 12 Letter Issued to Plaintiff regarding #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - Responses due by 10/7/2019. (Tripp, S.) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Notice filed by Samantha Jones Ingram (Certificate of Scope of Employment and Substitution). (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Memorandum in Support regarding #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Samantha Jones Ingram. (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Samantha Jones Ingram. (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Gladys Blount. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Self-Representation filed by Gladys Blount. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter from S. Collins, Deputy Clerk to Gladys Blount following up on letter dated 8/9/19 requesting notice of self representation and financial disclosure statement forms. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Samantha Jones Ingram answer due 9/16/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/13/2019. (A certified copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Gladys Blount, 8229 Frenchorn Lane, Fayetteville, NC 28314.) (Collins, S.) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Collins, S.) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Samantha Jones Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice filed by Samantha Jones Ingram (Letter to Cumberland County Clerk of Court dated August 8, 2019). (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to file a Notice of Self Representation sent to Pro Se Plaintiff Gladys Blount at 8229 Frenchorn Lane, Fayetteville, NC 28314 mailed via US mail on August 9, 2019. A copy of notice along with a blank notice of self representation and a blank financial disclosure statement. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Neal Fowler on behalf of Samantha Jones Ingram. (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Samantha Jones Ingram from District Court - Cumberland County, case number 19 CVD 3037., filed by Samantha Jones Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint, Order for Samantha Jones Ingram, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Supplemental Cover Removal Coversheet) (Fowler, Neal) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neal Fowler