This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2021 at 07:00:11 (UTC).

Bloom et al v. Anderson et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 Bloom filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Anderson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sarah D. Morrison, Algenon L. Marbley and Kimberly A. Jolson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04534

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kimberly A. Jolson

Presiding Judges

Sarah D. Morrison

Algenon L. Marbley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Roberta Bloom

Arlene Pogolowitz

Joan Randell

Defendants

Christopher D Pappas

Charles E Jones

K. Jon Taylor

Luis A Reyes

Julia L Johnson

Donald T Misheff

Steven J Demetriou

Leslie M Turner

James F. Pearson

Thomas N Mitchell

Michael J Anderson

James F O'Neil

Michael Dowling

Steven E. Strah

Robert Reffner

Sandra Pianalto

James F O'Neil, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J Boyle, Jr.

Attorney at Meyer Wilson, LPA

1320 Dublin Road, Suite 100

Columbus, OH 43215

David P Meyer

Attorney at Meyer Wilson Co., LPA

305 W. Nationwide Blvd.

Columbus, OH 43215

Matthew R Wilson

Attorney at Meyer Wilson Co., LPA

305 W. Nationwide Blvd.

Columbus, OH 43215

Ligaya T. Hernandez

Attorney at Hynes & Hernandez, LLC

101 Lindenwood Drive, Suite 225

Malvern, PA 19355

Defendant Attorneys

Geoffrey J. Ritts

Attorney at Jones Day

901 Lakeside Ave.

Cleveland, OH 44114

Marjorie P Duffy

325 John H. Mcconnell Blvd., Suite 600

Columbus, OH 43216

Robert Stephen Faxon

Attorney at Jones Day

901 Lakeside Ave

Cleveland, OH 44114

Jason J Mendro

1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Christopher W.H. Sullivan

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Douglas L. Shively

Attorney at BakerHostetler LLP

127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

F. Joseph Warin

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Carole Schwartz Rendon

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114-1214

William Scherman

Attorney at GIBSON, DUNN & CRUTCHER LLP

1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W.

Washington, DC 20036-5306

Daniel Rubin Warren

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114-1214

John A Favret, III

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

925 Euclid Ave., Suite 1150

Cleveland, OH 44115

John F McCaffrey

Attorney at Tucker Ellis LLP

950 Main Avenue, Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

Other Attorneys

Ann H. MacDonald

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60606

Barry S. Hyman

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60606

Daniel John Donnellon

Attorney at SEBALY SHILLITO + DYER

9100 West Chester Towne Centre Drive, Suite 210

West Chester, OH 45069

Elise H. Yu

Attorney at Schiff Hardin LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 7100

Chicago, IL 60606

6 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#46

(#64) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/18/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (kk2) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

24 #1

Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record for

24 #17

Main Document

22 #1

Exhibit 1

22 #15

Main Document

21 #1

Appendix Good Standing Cert.

21 #14

Main Document

20 #13

Main Document

#121

(#63) ORDER granting (119) in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ; (41) in case 2:20-cv-05128-ALM-KAJ;(62) in case 2:20-cv-04534-ALM-KAJ; (44) in case 2:20-cv-05237-ALM-KAJ; (24) in case 2:20-cv-05610-ALM-KAJ; and (17) in case 2:20-cv-05876-ALM-KAJMotion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorneys Kerin Lyn Kaminski and Karen L Giffen for FirstEnergy Corp. Attorneys Lawrence Heftman; Barry S. Hyman; Ann H. MacDonald; Kayvan B. Sadeghi; Kevin J. Whelan; Elise H. Yu; Daniel John Donnellon and James Alan Dyer terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/20/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (kk2) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to James F. Pearson on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Boyle, Michael) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to FirstEnergy Corporation on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Boyle, Michael) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Michael Dowling on 9/4/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Boyle, Michael) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7636053), filed by Joan Randell, Roberta Bloom, Arlene Pogolowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Boyle, Michael) Modified on 9/2/2020 to add demand (kk2) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/18/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (kk2) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) ORDER granting (119) in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ; (41) in case 2:20-cv-05128-ALM-KAJ;(62) in case 2:20-cv-04534-ALM-KAJ; (44) in case 2:20-cv-05237-ALM-KAJ; (24) in case 2:20-cv-05610-ALM-KAJ; and (17) in case 2:20-cv-05876-ALM-KAJMotion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorneys Kerin Lyn Kaminski and Karen L Giffen for FirstEnergy Corp. Attorneys Lawrence Heftman; Barry S. Hyman; Ann H. MacDonald; Kayvan B. Sadeghi; Kevin J. Whelan; Elise H. Yu; Daniel John Donnellon and James Alan Dyer terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/20/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (kk2) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) MOTION to Substitute Attorney for Nominal Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. ( Responses due by 8/9/2021) by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record for Nominal Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Dyer, James) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • Docket(#61) NOTATION ORDER - Defendant FirstEnergy is ORDERED to file any motion to stay by July 21, 2021. If FirstEnergy does not file such a motion, the parties shall file a joint status report by July 26, 2021, setting forth proposed case deadlines to govern this matter moving forward. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/1/21. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (jr) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) STATUS REPORT of Nominal Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. Concerning Formation of a Special Litigation Committee by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Dyer, James) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting (59) in case 2:20-cv-04534-ALM-KAJ; granting (107) in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ; granting (38) in case 2:20-cv-05128-ALM-KAJ; granting (41) in case 2:20-cv-05237-ALM-KAJ; granting (21) in case 2:20-cv-05610-ALM-KAJ; and granting (14) in case 2:20-cv-05876-ALM-KAJ - Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kayvan B. Sadeghi. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless he has done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/25/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (er) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting (58) in case 2:20-cv-04534-ALM-KAJ; granting (106) in case 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ; granting (37) in case 2:20-cv-05128-ALM-KAJ; granting (40) in case 2:20-cv-05237-ALM-KAJ; granting (20) in case 2:20-cv-05610-ALM-KAJ; and granting (13) in case 2:20-cv-05876-ALM-KAJ - Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Barry S. Hyman, Larry H. Heftman, Ann H. MacDonald, Elise H. Yu, and Kevin J. Whelan. PHV Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 6/25/2021. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (er) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8375667) of Kayvan B. Sadeghi( Responses due by 7/15/2021) by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Good Standing Cert.) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Dyer, James) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $1000 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8375658) of Barry S. Hyman, Lawrence H. Heftman, Ann H. MacDonald, Elise H. Yo, Kevin J. Whelan( Responses due by 7/15/2021) by Defendant FirstEnergy Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Dyer, James) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) NOTICE of Appearance by James Alan Dyer for Defendant FirstEnergy Corp. Associated Cases: 2:20-cv-04813-ALM-KAJ et al. (Dyer, James) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Christopher D Pappas on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Boyle, Michael) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Leslie M Turner on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Boyle, Michael) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Luis A Reyes on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Boyle, Michael) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Robert Reffner on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Boyle, Michael) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Steven E. Strah on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Boyle, Michael) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to K. Jon Taylor on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Boyle, Michael) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to James F. Pearson on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Boyle, Michael) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to FirstEnergy Corporation on 9/3/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Boyle, Michael) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Michael Dowling on 9/4/2020, answer due 11/3/2020. (Boyle, Michael) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7636053), filed by Joan Randell, Roberta Bloom, Arlene Pogolowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Boyle, Michael) Modified on 9/2/2020 to add demand (kk2) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel J. Donnellon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ann H. MacDonald