This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2020 at 09:06:27 (UTC).

Blocker v. State of Michigan et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2020 Blocker filed a Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality lawsuit against State of Michigan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert J. Jonker and Phillip J. Green. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00772

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - State Statute Constitutionality

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert J. Jonker

Referral Judge

Phillip J. Green

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Corey Blocker

Lansing, MI 48909

Defendants

Gretchen Whitmer

State of Michigan

 

Court Documents

22 #1

Attachment

#22

(#22) ORDER REJECTING Motion to subpoena submitted by Corey Blocker ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

21 #1

Attachment

#21

(#21) ORDER REJECTING Statement of Fact submitted by Corey Blocker; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

20 #1

Attachment

#20

(#20) ORDER REJECTING Motion to subpoena submitted by Corey Blocker; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

18 #1

Attachment

#18

(#18) ORDER REJECTING Motion to collateral attack this case submitted by Corey Blocker; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

17 #1

Attachment

#17

(#17) ORDER REJECTING Statement of Fact submitted by Corey Blocker; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#7

Copy of Report and Recommendation #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (mg) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#6

Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (clw) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#4

Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (mg) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#5

(#5) STATEMENT OF CASE by plaintiff Corey Blocker (mg) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#3

(#3) Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Green indicating that this case is related to 1:20-cv-444 (mg) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (mg) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Order Rejecting Pleading #21 , Order Rejecting Pleading #22 with original documents sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (jlg) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER REJECTING Motion to subpoena submitted by Corey Blocker ; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER REJECTING Statement of Fact submitted by Corey Blocker; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Order Rejecting Pleading #20 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (ndj) Modified text on 10/8/2020 (ndj). (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER REJECTING Motion to subpoena submitted by Corey Blocker; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Order Rejecting Pleading #17 with original document sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (jlg) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Order Rejecting Pleading #18 with original documents, Order Rejecting Pleading #19 with original documents sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (tlbu) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER REJECTING Motion for fraud upon the court submitted by Corey Blocker; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER REJECTING Motion to collateral attack this case submitted by Corey Blocker; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER REJECTING Statement of Fact submitted by Corey Blocker; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkw) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Report and Recommendation #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (mg) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (clw) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Receipt of Case Notice #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (mg) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of receipt of case (mg) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATEMENT OF CASE by plaintiff Corey Blocker (mg) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Green indicating that this case is related to 1:20-cv-444 (mg) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (mg) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against State of Michigan, Gretchen Whitmer filed by Corey Blocker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (mg) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less