This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2021 at 20:27:16 (UTC).

Blitzsafe Texas, LLC v. Sony Corporation

Case Summary

On May 12, 2021, Blitzsafe Texas LLC, (“Blitzsafe” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Ross Fabricant, Peter Lambrianakos and Vincent J Rubino, III of Fabricant LLP filed an intellectual property lawsuit against Sony Corporation (“Defendant” or “Sony”), seeking injunctive relief and compensatory damages for alleged patent infringement by the Defendant. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Eastern District of Texas with Judge Rodney Gilstrap presiding

 

Plaintiff asserted that Blitzsafe is the owner of all rights, title, and interest in and to the U.S. Patent No. 7,489,786 and U.S. Patent No. 8,155,342. (together, the “Patents-in-Suit”), and holds the exclusive right to take all actions necessary to enforce its rights to the Patents-in-Suit, including the filing of this patent infringement lawsuit. Blitzsafe also asserted that it has the right to recover all damages for past, present, and future infringement of the Patents-in-Suit and to seek injunctive relief as appropriate under the law.

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff has alleged that “Defendant has been manufacturing, importing, offering to sell, selling, and/or importing into the United States audio and multimedia integration systems, including but not limited to, XAV-AX100, since at least as early as 2015 (hereinafter collectively referred to as “Infotainment Systems”).” “Defendant has and continues to directly infringe one or more claims of the ’786 Patent, including claim 57, either literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, by making, using, offering to sell, selling, and/or importing into the United States infringing Infotainment Systems without authority and in violation of 35 U.S.C. § 271.”

 

Blitzcafe has further alleged that “Defendant has and continues to indirectly infringe one or more claims of the ’786 Patent by knowingly and intentionally inducing others to directly infringe, either literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, by making, using, offering to sell, selling, and/or importing into the United States the infringing Infotainment Systems. Defendant induced infringement by others, including automotive OEMs and end users, with the intent to cause infringing acts by others or, in the alternative, with the intent to cause infringing acts by other or, in the alternative, with the belief that there was a high probability that others, including automotive OEMs and end users, infringe the ’786 Patent, but while remaining willfully blind to the infringement.”

 

There are two counts for relief laid down by the Plaintiff. The first count for relief is for the alleged infringement of the ’786 Patent. The second count for relief is for the alleged infringement of the ‘342 patent. Plaintiff alleged that the infringement was committed directly, either literally by making, using, offering to sell, selling, and/or importing into the United States the infringing Infotainment Systems, and also that Defendant has and continues to indirectly infringe one or more claims of the Patent by knowingly and intentionally inducing others to directly infringe, either literally or under the doctrine of equivalents, by making, using, offering to sell, selling, and/or importing into the United States the infringing Infotainment Systems.

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff has requested to the Court to adjudge that the Defendant has wilfully and deliberately infringed the patents directly or indirectly and thus, the Court may permanently enjoin Defendants and associated persons pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 283 from further infringing the patents and award suitable damages along with costs, fees and any other relief that the Court may deem just and proper. 

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents. 

 

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00166

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blitzsafe Texas, LLC

Defendant

Sony Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alfred Ross Fabricant

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

Peter Lambrianakos

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

Vincent J Rubino, III

Attorney at Fabricant LLP - NY

230 Park Avenue, 3Rd Floor W.

New York, NY 10169

Jennifer Leigh Truelove

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C. - Marshall

104 East Houston St, Suite 300

Marshall, TX 75670

Samuel Franklin Baxter

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C. - Marshall

104 East Houston St, Suite 300

Marshall, TX 75670

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Leigh Truelove on behalf of Blitzsafe Texas, LLC (Truelove, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Franklin Baxter on behalf of Blitzsafe Texas, LLC (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Sony Corporation. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of Blitzsafe Texas, LLC (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Lambrianakos on behalf of Blitzsafe Texas, LLC (Lambrianakos, Peter) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of Blitzsafe Texas, LLC (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blitzsafe Texas, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Blitzsafe of America, Inc. for Blitzsafe Texas, LLC. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Sony Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8409348.), filed by Blitzsafe Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Leigh Truelove on behalf of Blitzsafe Texas, LLC (Truelove, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Franklin Baxter on behalf of Blitzsafe Texas, LLC (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Sony Corporation. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of Blitzsafe Texas, LLC (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Lambrianakos on behalf of Blitzsafe Texas, LLC (Lambrianakos, Peter) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of Blitzsafe Texas, LLC (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blitzsafe Texas, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Blitzsafe of America, Inc. for Blitzsafe Texas, LLC. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Sony Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8409348.), filed by Blitzsafe Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Blitzsafe Texas, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SONY CORPORATION OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter Lambrianakos

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alfred Ross Fabricant