This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 08:13:07 (UTC).

Blitzsafe Texas, LLC v. PACCAR Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Blitzsafe Texas, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against PACCAR Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00393

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blitzsafe Texas, LLC

Defendant

PACCAR Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Michael Mercadante

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Peter Lambrianakos

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Daniel James Shea, Jr

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Alfred Ross Fabricant

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Alessandra Carcaterra Messing

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Vincent J Rubino, III

Attorney at Brown Rudnick, LLP - New York

Seven Times Square 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Defendant Attorneys

Syed Kamil Fareed

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP - Austin

98 San Jacinto Blvd, Suite 1500

Austin, TX 78701-4078

Lisa Marie Kattan

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP - D.C.

1299 Pennsylvania Ave Nw #120

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re PACCAR Inc..( Fareed, Syed) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#14

(#14) ***FILED IN ERROR***Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re PACCAR Inc..( Fareed, Syed) Modified on 1/21/2020 (ch, ). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#13

(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blitzsafe Texas, LLC. PACCAR Inc. served on 12/4/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#12

(#12) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re PACCAR Inc..( Fareed, Syed) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alessandra Carcaterra Messing on behalf of Blitzsafe Texas, LLC (Messing, Alessandra) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of Blitzsafe Texas, LLC (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Lambrianakos on behalf of Blitzsafe Texas, LLC (Lambrianakos, Peter) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to PACCAR Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of Blitzsafe Texas, LLC (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blitzsafe Texas, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Blitzsafe of America, Inc. for Blitzsafe Texas, LLC. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - US 8,155,342

1 #1

Exhibit A - US 7,489,786

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against PACCAR Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7554897.), filed by Blitzsafe Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US 7,489,786, #2 Exhibit B - US 8,155,342, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lisa Marie Kattan on behalf of All Defendants (Kattan, Lisa) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for PACCAR Inc. to 2/11/2020. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re PACCAR Inc..( Fareed, Syed) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR. SECONED APPLICATION CAN ONLY BE FOR 15 DAYS Document # 14, Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ***FILED IN ERROR***Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re PACCAR Inc..( Fareed, Syed) Modified on 1/21/2020 (ch, ). (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blitzsafe Texas, LLC. PACCAR Inc. served on 12/4/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for PACCAR Inc. to 1/27/2020. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re PACCAR Inc..( Fareed, Syed) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR. FIRST APPLICATION CAN'T BE OVER 30 DAYS Document # 11, Unopposed Application for Extension of Time. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alessandra Carcaterra Messing on behalf of Blitzsafe Texas, LLC (Messing, Alessandra) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of Blitzsafe Texas, LLC (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Lambrianakos on behalf of Blitzsafe Texas, LLC (Lambrianakos, Peter) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to PACCAR Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of Blitzsafe Texas, LLC (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Blitzsafe Texas, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Blitzsafe of America, Inc. for Blitzsafe Texas, LLC. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against PACCAR Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7554897.), filed by Blitzsafe Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US 7,489,786, #2 Exhibit B - US 8,155,342, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less