This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2021 at 09:00:03 (UTC).

BLISS v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 BLISS filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is W. Scott Hardy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00147

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

W. Scott Hardy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SUNCERRE BLISS

Defendants

ETHICON, INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter D. Giglione

Charles G Orr

Defendant Attorneys

Kristen Hock Prex

Frederick W. Bode, III

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

#8

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

5 #1

Affidavit of Charles G. Orr in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice

#5

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

2 #1

Summons

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/30/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick W. Bode, III on behalf of ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (Bode, Frederick) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON Answer due from ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (Prex, Kristen) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #11 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer. ERROR: Caption and/or Case number of document does not match caption and/or case number of case. CORRECTION: Attorney is directed to file an Errata with corrected caption/and or case number. (ma) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON Answer due from ETHICON, INC. on 4/12/2021; JOHNSON & JOHNSON on 4/12/2021. (Prex, Kristen) Wrong case number on document. Document removed from public view and refiled at #12 . Modified on 2/16/2021 (ma). (Entered: 02/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Hock Prex on behalf of ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (Prex, Kristen) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Charles Orr to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 2/5/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kas) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Proposed Order re #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice OF CHARLES G. ORR by SUNCERRE BLISS. (Orr, Charles) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Errata re #4 Notice, Reason for Correction: Filed under incorrect docket. (dms) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Errata re #3 Notice of ADR Designation, Reason for Correction: Filed under incorrect docket. (dms) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/04/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (ma) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) MOTION for attorney Charles G. Orr to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6306289) by SUNCERRE BLISS. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Charles G. Orr in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice) (Orr, Charles) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this document. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (dms) Wrong document attached. Document removed from public view, refiled as an errata at #7 . Modified on 2/4/2021 (ma). (Entered: 02/02/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dms) Wrong document attached. Document removed from public view, refiled as an errata at #6 . Modified on 2/4/2021 (ma). (Entered: 02/02/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ma) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6297917), filed by SUNCERRE BLISS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less