Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2019 at 07:12:18 (UTC).

James F. Bliss et al v. ZF Friedrichshafen AG et al

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 James F Bliss filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against ZF Friedrichshafen AG. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Frederick F. Mumm. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00970

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Frederick F. Mumm

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thomas H. Price

James F. Bliss

Defendants

Honda R&D Co., Ltd.

ZF Friedrichshafen AG

TRW AUTOMOTIVE U.S. LLC

Hyundai Motor Group

Hyundai Motor America

Honda Motor Co., Ltd.

Hyundai Motor Co.

HONDA OF AMERICA MFG. INC.

American Honda Motor Co., Inc

ZF TRW AUTOMOTIVE HOLDINGS CORP., a Delaware corporation

TRW Automotive Inc.

TRW VEHICLE SAFETY SYSTEMS INC.

ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

G Randall Garrou

Attorney at Weston Garrou and Mooney

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 525

Los Angeles, CA 90025-1176

John H Weston

Attorney at Weston Garrou and Mooney

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 525

Los Angeles, CA 90025-1176

Richard M Hagstrom

Attorney at Hellmuth and Johnson PLLC

8050 West 78Th Street

Edina, MN 55439

Michael R Cashman

Attorney at Hellmuth and Johnson PLLC

8050 West 78Th Street

Edina, MN 55439

Jerome H Mooney

Attorney at Weston Garrou and Mooney

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 525

Los Angeles, CA 90025-1176

Defendant Attorneys

Tammy Ann Tsoumas

Attorney at Kirkland and Ellis LLP

333 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Mark C Holscher

Attorney at Kirkland and Ellis LLP

333 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Lisa Gilford

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 West Fifth Street Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Stacy R Horth-Neubert

Attorney at Sidley Austin LLP

555 West Fifth Street, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90013

 

Court Documents

#42

(#42) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thomas H. Price, James F. Bliss, upon Defendant Honda of America Mfg. Inc. served on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Susan May, Statutory Agent Corp. registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cashman, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#41

(#41) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thomas H. Price, James F. Bliss, upon Defendant Hyundai Motor America served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, CT Corporation Service registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cashman, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#40

(#40) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thomas H. Price, James F. Bliss, upon Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc served on 6/13/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, CT Corporation Service registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cashman, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#39

(#39) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thomas H. Price, James F. Bliss, upon Defendant TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. served on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Chelsea Delapez, CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cashman, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#38

(#38) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thomas H. Price, James F. Bliss, upon Defendant TRW Automotive U.S. LLC served on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Chelsea Delapez, CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cashman, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#37

(#37) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thomas H. Price, James F. Bliss, upon Defendant TRW Automotive Inc. served on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Chelsea Delapez, CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cashman, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#36

(#36) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thomas H. Price, James F. Bliss, upon Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp served on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Chelsea Delapez, CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cashman, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#35

(#35) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STAYING CASE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, places this matter on its inactive calendar pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (the Panel). Counsel shall file a joint report every 60 days, with the first report due on August 28, 2019; provided, however, a report shall be filed within five days of a decision by the Panel. Upon receiving a report with respect to an action by the Panel, the Court will determine whether the matter will be returned to its active calendar. All other dates and deadlines are vacated. The stipulation seeking an extension of time to respond to the Complaint is moot. Dkt. 28. JS-6: Stayed/Inactive Calendar (shb) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#34

(#34) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to American Honda Motor Co., Inc answer now due 8/5/2019; Honda of America Mfg. Inc. answer now due 8/2/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc; Honda of America Mfg. Inc..(Gilford, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gregory S Otsuka. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Richard M Hagstrom. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael R Cashman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit List of additional parties and lawyers

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs James F. Bliss, Thomas H. Price. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of additional parties and lawyers)(Garrou, G) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#1

(#34) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to American Honda Motor Co., Inc answer now due 8/5/2019; Honda of America Mfg. Inc. answer now due 8/2/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc; Honda of America Mfg. Inc..(Gilford, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thomas H. Price, James F. Bliss, upon Defendant Honda of America Mfg. Inc. served on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Susan May, Statutory Agent Corp. registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cashman, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thomas H. Price, James F. Bliss, upon Defendant Hyundai Motor America served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, CT Corporation Service registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cashman, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thomas H. Price, James F. Bliss, upon Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc served on 6/13/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, CT Corporation Service registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cashman, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thomas H. Price, James F. Bliss, upon Defendant TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. served on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Chelsea Delapez, CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cashman, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thomas H. Price, James F. Bliss, upon Defendant TRW Automotive U.S. LLC served on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Chelsea Delapez, CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cashman, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thomas H. Price, James F. Bliss, upon Defendant TRW Automotive Inc. served on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Chelsea Delapez, CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cashman, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Thomas H. Price, James F. Bliss, upon Defendant ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp served on 6/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Chelsea Delapez, CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cashman, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STAYING CASE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, places this matter on its inactive calendar pending a decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (the Panel). Counsel shall file a joint report every 60 days, with the first report due on August 28, 2019; provided, however, a report shall be filed within five days of a decision by the Panel. Upon receiving a report with respect to an action by the Panel, the Court will determine whether the matter will be returned to its active calendar. All other dates and deadlines are vacated. The stipulation seeking an extension of time to respond to the Complaint is moot. Dkt. 28. JS-6: Stayed/Inactive Calendar (shb) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to American Honda Motor Co., Inc answer now due 8/5/2019; Honda of America Mfg. Inc. answer now due 8/2/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc; Honda of America Mfg. Inc..(Gilford, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants American Honda Motor Co., Inc, Honda of America Mfg. Inc.. correcting Notice of Appearance, #31 (Horth-Neubert, Stacy) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richard M Hagstrom to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs James F. Bliss, Thomas H. Price (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23824385) filed by plaintiffs James F. Bliss, Thomas H. Price. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Pro-Hac Vice Application) (Garrou, G) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs James F. Bliss, Thomas H. Price, (Garrou, G) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gregory S Otsuka. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Richard M Hagstrom. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael R Cashman. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs James F. Bliss, Thomas H. Price. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of additional parties and lawyers)(Garrou, G) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23781970 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Thomas H. Price, James F. Bliss. (Attorney G Randall Garrou added to party James F. Bliss(pty:pla), Attorney G Randall Garrou added to party Thomas H. Price(pty:pla))(Garrou, G) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZF TRW Automotive Holdings Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HONDA R&D AMERICAS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where HONDA OF AMERICA MFG, INC is a litigant