This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2021 at 07:55:04 (UTC).

Bledsoe v. Transportation Security Administration et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 Bledsoe filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Transportation Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brett H Ludwig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01224

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brett H Ludwig

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Faith Bledsoe

Milwaukee, WI 53212

Defendants

Transportation Security Administration

Los Angeles International Airport

Dallas Forth Worth International Airport

Spirit Airlines Inc

Delta Air Lines Inc

American Airlines Inc

Hernandez

Watson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew T Stoker

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP

411 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 2400

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Eric W Matzke

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP

411 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 2400

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Emery K Harlan

Attorney at MWH Law Group LLP

735 N Water St - Ste 610

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Christina A Katt

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

555 E Wells St - Ste 1730

Milwaukee, WI 53202

William J Katt

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

555 E Wells St - Ste 1730

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Angela B Harden

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

511 N Broadway - Ste 1100

Milwaukee, WI 53202

David B Carr

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

511 N Broadway - Ste 1100

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Ex. A - Unpublished Decisions

18 #18

Main Document

#17

(#17) BRIEF in Support filed by Spirit Airlines Inc re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (Harlan, Emery)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Spirit Airlines Inc. (Harlan, Emery)

#15

(#15) DISCLOSURE Statement by Spirit Airlines Inc. (Harlan, Emery)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Emery K Harlan on behalf of Spirit Airlines Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Emery K Harlan (Harlan, Emery)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Angela B Harden on behalf of American Airlines Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Angela B. Harden (Harden, Angela)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew T Stoker on behalf of Los Angeles International Airport. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew T. Stoker (Stoker, Andrew)

11 #1

Certificate of Service

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Los Angeles International Airport. (Matzke, Eric)

9 #1

Certificate of Service

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by William J Katt on behalf of Delta Air Lines Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: William Katt (Katt, William)

#7

(#7) BRIEF in Support filed by Delta Air Lines Inc re #6 MOTION to Dismiss . (Katt, Christina)

6 #1

Certificate of Service

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Christina A Katt on behalf of Delta Air Lines Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Christina A. Katt (Katt, Christina)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DECLARATION of Emery K Harlan in Support of Defendant Spirit Airlines, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Unpublished Decisions)(Harlan, Emery)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) BRIEF in Support filed by Spirit Airlines Inc re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (Harlan, Emery)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Spirit Airlines Inc. (Harlan, Emery)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DISCLOSURE Statement by Spirit Airlines Inc. (Harlan, Emery)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Emery K Harlan on behalf of Spirit Airlines Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Emery K Harlan (Harlan, Emery)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Angela B Harden on behalf of American Airlines Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Angela B. Harden (Harden, Angela)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew T Stoker on behalf of Los Angeles International Airport. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrew T. Stoker (Stoker, Andrew)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) BRIEF in Support filed by Los Angeles International Airport re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Matzke, Eric)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Los Angeles International Airport. (Matzke, Eric)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric W Matzke on behalf of Los Angeles International Airport. Attorney(s) appearing: Eric W. Matzke (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Matzke, Eric)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by William J Katt on behalf of Delta Air Lines Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: William Katt (Katt, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) BRIEF in Support filed by Delta Air Lines Inc re #6 MOTION to Dismiss . (Katt, Christina)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Delta Air Lines Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Katt, Christina)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Christina A Katt on behalf of Delta Air Lines Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Christina A. Katt (Katt, Christina)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by American Airlines Inc.(Carr, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Faith Bledsoe. American Airlines Inc served on 11/1/2021; Dallas Forth Worth International Airport served on 11/1/2021; Delta Air Lines Inc served on 11/1/2021; Hernandez served on 11/1/2021; Los Angeles International Airport served on 11/1/2021; Spirit Airlines Inc served on 11/1/2021; Transportation Security Administration served on 11/1/2021; Watson served on 11/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Subpoena)(kah) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Faith Bledsoe. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (kah) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against American Airlines Inc, Dallas Forth Worth International Airport, Delta Air Lines Inc, Hernandez, Los Angeles International Airport, Spirit Airlines Inc, Transportation Security Administration, Watson filed by Faith Bledsoe. Jury Demand. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (Filing Fee PAID ; MK4689-087766) (Service Packet Issued)(kah) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dallas/Fort Worth International Airport Board is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ANGELES INTERNATIONAL AIRPORT is a litigant

Latest cases where TRANSPORTATION SECURITY ADMINISTRATION A GOVERNMENTAL ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where SPIRIT AIRLINES INC. is a litigant