This case was last updated from PACER on 08/07/2020 at 05:59:45 (UTC).

Bledsoe v. Davis Case has been transferred to Eastern District of Texas.

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 Bledsoe filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Davis Case has been transferred to Eastern District of Texas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alfred H Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02723

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred H Bennett

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jamie Lee Bledsoe

Huntsville, TX 77349

Respondent

Lorie Davis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Edward Larry Marshall

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

Po Box 12548

Austin, TX 78711

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit

#8

(#8) MOTION for Recusal by Jamie Lee Bledsoe, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ckrus, 4) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION pursuant to the one year statute of limitations in 28 USC 244(d) by Jamie Lee Bledsoe, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2020. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION in reference to injustice by the 7th Judicial Court of Harris County by Jamie Lee Bledsoe, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2020. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for evidentiary Hearing by Jamie Lee Bledsoe, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2020. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for court of inquiry by Jamie Lee Bledsoe, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2020. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jamie Lee Bledsoe, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2020. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Cover letter

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Jamie Lee Bledsoe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ckrus, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2020: #2 Cover letter) (ckrus, 4). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2020: #3 Envelope) (ckrus, 4). (Entered: 08/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Recusal by Jamie Lee Bledsoe, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ckrus, 4) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION pursuant to the one year statute of limitations in 28 USC 244(d) by Jamie Lee Bledsoe, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2020. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION in reference to injustice by the 7th Judicial Court of Harris County by Jamie Lee Bledsoe, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2020. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for evidentiary Hearing by Jamie Lee Bledsoe, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2020. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for court of inquiry by Jamie Lee Bledsoe, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2020. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jamie Lee Bledsoe, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2020. (ckrus, 4) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Jamie Lee Bledsoe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ckrus, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2020: #2 Cover letter) (ckrus, 4). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/4/2020: #3 Envelope) (ckrus, 4). (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less