This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/22/2019 at 07:21:38 (UTC).

BLEDSOE v. COX et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2019 BLEDSOE filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against COX. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00212

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kyle R Bledsoe

KYLE R. BLEDSOE

Franklin, IN 46131

Defendants

C.O. Butcher

Major DUANE BURGESS

C.O. Kendall

C.O. Banholzer

C.O. George

C.O. McDaniels

Corporal Driver

Sheriff DOUG COX

C.O. Evans

Sergeant Ransdell

C.O. Hess

DUANE BURGESS

RANSDELL

BUTCHER

GEORGE

EVANS

DOUG COX

BAHNOLZER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Joseph Layden

Attorney at WILLIAMS BARRETT & WILKOWSKI, LLP

600 North Emerson Avenue, P.O. Box 405

Greenwood, IN 46142

William W. Barrett

Attorney at WILLIAMS HEWITT BARRETT & WILKOWSKI LLP

600 North Emerson Avenue, P.O. Box 405

Greenwood, IN 46142

 

Court Documents

#7

9 #1

Envelope

#9

8 #1

Envelope

#8

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit State Court Record (Complaint, Motion for Fee Waiver, Order on Fee Waive

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Pro Se Appearance, filed by Plaintiff KYLE R. BLEDSOE (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (NAD) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against BAHNOLZER, DUANE BURGESS, BUTCHER, DOUG COX, DRIVER, EVANS, GEORGE, HESS, KENDALL, MCDANIELS, RANSDELL, filed by KYLE R. BLEDSOE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER dismissing complaint and directing filing of Amended Complaint. The dismissal of the complaint will not in this instance lead to the dismissal of the action at present, the plaintiff shall have through February 20, 2019, in which to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/28/2019 (dist made)(CBU) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting Defendants' #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint. Defendants are hereby granted an enlargement, to and including February 26, 2019, to file a response to the Complaint, including without limitation any motion(s) under Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 1/25/2019. (SWM) Modified on 1/25/2019 (SWM). (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by William W. Barrett on behalf of Defendants DUANE BURGESS, C.O. Banholzer, C.O. Butcher, DOUG COX, Corporal Driver, C.O. Evans, C.O. George, C.O. Hess, C.O. Kendall, C.O. McDaniels, Sergeant Ransdell. (Barrett, William) (Entered: 01/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to February 26, 2019 , filed by Defendants DUANE BURGESS, C.O. Banholzer, C.O. Butcher, DOUG COX, Corporal Driver, C.O. Evans, C.O. George, C.O. Hess, C.O. Kendall, C.O. McDaniels, Sergeant Ransdell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Layden, Daniel) (Entered: 01/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Joseph Layden on behalf of Defendants DUANE BURGESS, C.O. Banholzer, C.O. Butcher, DOUG COX, Corporal Driver, C.O. Evans, C.O. George, C.O. Hess, C.O. Kendall, C.O. McDaniels, Sergeant Ransdell. (Layden, Daniel) (Entered: 01/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Johnson County Superior Court No. 4, case number 41D04-1812-MI-000312, filed by C.O. Kendall, Sergeant Ransdell, DUANE BURGESS, C.O. George, C.O. McDaniels, Corporal Driver, C.O. Banholzer, DOUG COX, C.O. Evans, C.O. Hess, C.O. Butcher. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5245580) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record (Complaint, Motion for Fee Waiver, Order on Fee Waiver, Order of Recusal, Order to Secure Video Evidence, Notice of Appointment of Special Judge, Appearance of William W. Barrett and Daniel J. Layden), #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Layden, Daniel) Modified on 1/23/2019 (double docket text) (DJH). (Entered: 01/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C.O. Evans is a litigant

Latest cases where Butcher is a litigant

Latest cases where EVANS is a litigant

Latest cases where The Law Offices of George A Gallegos is a litigant