This case was last updated from PACER on 10/16/2021 at 10:21:09 (UTC).

Blazek v. Heavens Urgent Care LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 Blazek filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Heavens Urgent Care LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is G Murray Snow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01425

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

G Murray Snow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daltina Blazek

Defendants

Heavens Urgent Care LLC

Roxanne Heavens

Jason P Heavens

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patricia Nicole Syverson

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint PC - San Diego, CA

9655 Granite Ridge Dr., Ste. 200

San Diego, CA 92123

Ty Derek Frankel

Attorney at Bonnett Fairbourn Friedman & Balint PC - Phoenix, AZ

2325 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 300

Phoenix, AZ 85016

Defendant Attorney

Bradley D Gardner

Attorney at Udall Shumway PLC

1138 N Alma School Rd., Ste. 101

Mesa, AZ 85201-6695

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2021 at 02:30 PM. Plaintiff's counsel shall set up a call-in number and include the information in the joint report due a week before the scheduling conference. See document for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/24/2021. (REK) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#15

(#15) Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jason P Heavens, Roxanne Heavens, Heavens Urgent Care LLC.(Gardner, Bradley) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Heavens Urgent Care LLC. (Gardner, Bradley) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Heavens Urgent Care LLC. (KFZ) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Heavens Urgent Care LLC, Roxanne Heavens and Jason P. Heavens have until 9/24/2021, to file their Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/14/2021. (KFZ) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Jason P Heavens, Roxanne Heavens, Heavens Urgent Care LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gardner, Bradley) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#10

(#10) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Daltina Blazek: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint Civil Cover Sheet, Order, upon Heavens Urgent Care LLC on 9/3/21. (Frankel, Ty) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#9

(#9) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Daltina Blazek: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint Civil Cover Sheet, Order, upon Roxanne Heavens on 9/01/2021. (Frankel, Ty) *Modified to correct date of service on 9/9/2021 (REK). (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#8

(#8) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Daltina Blazek: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint Civil Cover Sheet, Order, upon Jason P. Heavens on 9/01/2021. (Frankel, Ty) *Modified to correct date of service on 9/9/2021 (REK). (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley D Gardner on behalf of Jason P Heavens, Roxanne Heavens, Heavens Urgent Care LLC. (Gardner, Bradley) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED if any Defendants file a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) or 12(c) and if Plaintiff contends any further amendment of her Complaint #1 can cure any alleged deficiency, Plaintiff must submit, no later than the time she files a response to a motion to dismiss, a proposed amended complaint containing all further allegations Plaintiff could make. FURTHER ORDERED that, in the event a motion to dismiss is granted in any part, no leave will be granted to amend the Complaint beyond what is offered in that proposed amended complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/19/2021. (KFZ) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m). IT IS ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 11/16/2021. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/19/2021. (KFZ) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

4 #2

Summons

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Jason P Heavens, Roxanne Heavens, Heavens Urgent Care LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 08/18/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19775337 filed by Daltina Blazek. (Frankel, Ty) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2021 at 02:30 PM. Plaintiff's counsel shall set up a call-in number and include the information in the joint report due a week before the scheduling conference. See document for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/24/2021. (REK) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Jason P Heavens, Roxanne Heavens, Heavens Urgent Care LLC.(Gardner, Bradley) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Heavens Urgent Care LLC. (Gardner, Bradley) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Heavens Urgent Care LLC. (KFZ) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Heavens Urgent Care LLC, Roxanne Heavens and Jason P. Heavens have until 9/24/2021, to file their Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/14/2021. (KFZ) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Jason P Heavens, Roxanne Heavens, Heavens Urgent Care LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gardner, Bradley) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Daltina Blazek: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint Civil Cover Sheet, Order, upon Heavens Urgent Care LLC on 9/3/21. (Frankel, Ty) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Daltina Blazek: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint Civil Cover Sheet, Order, upon Roxanne Heavens on 9/01/2021. (Frankel, Ty) *Modified to correct date of service on 9/9/2021 (REK). (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Daltina Blazek: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint Civil Cover Sheet, Order, upon Jason P. Heavens on 9/01/2021. (Frankel, Ty) *Modified to correct date of service on 9/9/2021 (REK). (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley D Gardner on behalf of Jason P Heavens, Roxanne Heavens, Heavens Urgent Care LLC. (Gardner, Bradley) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED if any Defendants file a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) or 12(c) and if Plaintiff contends any further amendment of her Complaint #1 can cure any alleged deficiency, Plaintiff must submit, no later than the time she files a response to a motion to dismiss, a proposed amended complaint containing all further allegations Plaintiff could make. FURTHER ORDERED that, in the event a motion to dismiss is granted in any part, no leave will be granted to amend the Complaint beyond what is offered in that proposed amended complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/19/2021. (KFZ) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m). IT IS ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 11/16/2021. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/19/2021. (KFZ) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Jason P Heavens, Roxanne Heavens, Heavens Urgent Care LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19775337. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-1425-PHX-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Daltina Blazek. (Frankel, Ty) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(JAM) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19775337 filed by Daltina Blazek. (Frankel, Ty) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less