This case was last updated from PACER on 02/28/2020 at 08:11:21 (UTC).

Blas

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 Blas was filed as a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy M. Burgess and Ralph R. Beistline. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00325

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Timothy M. Burgess

Ralph R. Beistline

 

Party Details

Appellant

Leo Blas

Chugiak, AK 99567

Appellee

Bank of America, N.A.

Trustees

Nacole M Jipping

Anchorage, AK 99501

Kenneth W. Battley

Anchorage, AK 99501

Office of the U.S. Trustee-Alaska

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorneys

Michael W. Seville

Attorney at Burr Pease & Kurtz

810 N Street, Suite 300

Anchorage, AK 99501

Cynthia Lowery-Graber

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

1700 Lincoln St. #4100

Denver, CO 80203

Trustee Attorney

Kathryn Perkins

Attorney at DOJ-Ust

700 Stewart Street, Suite 5103

Seattle, WA 98101

 

Court Documents

7 #1

1 Part 1 DE# 1 - DE# 54

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Leo Blas. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE OF USDC APPEAL NUMBER. cc: Bankruptcy Court. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

7 #8

DE# 288

#2

(#2) Application to Proceed without Pre-Paying Fee by Leo Blas.(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

1 #3

Transmittal of Appeal

1 #2

Notice of Requirements

7 #4

1 Part 4 DE# 1 - DE# 54

#7

(#7) Clerk's Certificate of Readiness (Attachments: #1 1 Part 1 DE# 1 - DE# 54, #2 1 Part 2 DE# 1 - DE# 54, #3 1 Part 3 DE# 1 - DE# 54, #4 1 Part 4 DE# 1 - DE# 54, #5 DE# 55 - DE# 74, #6 DE# 81 - DE# 181, #7 DE# 182 - DE# 280, #8 DE# 288)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

7 #6

DE# 81 - DE# 181

1 #1

Notice of Appeal

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number A17-00411. File received, filed by Leo Blas. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Notice of Requirements, #3 Transmittal of Appeal)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

7 #2

1 Part 2 DE# 1 - DE# 54

7 #5

DE# 55 - DE# 74

7 #3

1 Part 3 DE# 1 - DE# 54

7 #7

DE# 182 - DE# 280

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Clerk's Certificate of Readiness (Attachments: #1 1 Part 1 DE# 1 - DE# 54, #2 1 Part 2 DE# 1 - DE# 54, #3 1 Part 3 DE# 1 - DE# 54, #4 1 Part 4 DE# 1 - DE# 54, #5 DE# 55 - DE# 74, #6 DE# 81 - DE# 181, #7 DE# 182 - DE# 280, #8 DE# 288)(PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(#6) TMB TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. By agreement of the judges, the above referenced case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Ralph R. Beistline for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:19-cv-00325-RRB. (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE OF USDC APPEAL NUMBER (RMC, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Leo Blas. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE OF USDC APPEAL NUMBER. cc: Bankruptcy Court. (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Application to Proceed without Pre-Paying Fee by Leo Blas.(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number A17-00411. File received, filed by Leo Blas. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Notice of Requirements, #3 Transmittal of Appeal)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less