This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 10:21:45 (UTC).

AUSTIN et al v. FLORIDA LOTTERY

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 AUSTIN filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against FLORIDA LOTTERY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are CHARLES A STAMPELOS, MARK E WALKER and ALLEN C WINSOR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00168

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

CHARLES A STAMPELOS

Presiding Judges

MARK E WALKER

ALLEN C WINSOR

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JEANNETTE L. AUSTIN

AGNES REGINA BLANTON

KRISTINA REIS

JEANNETTE L AUSTIN

Defendants

THE FLORIDA LOTTERY

FLORIDA LOTTERY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARY LEE PRINTY

Attorney at GARY L PRINTY PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

1804 Miccosukee Commons Dr Ste 200

Tallahassee, FL 32308

MARIE A MATTOX

Attorney at MARIE A MATTOX PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

203 North Gadsden Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

JAMES GARRITY

Attorney at MARIE A MATTOX PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

203 North Gadsden Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

RICHARD ERROL JOHNSON

Attorney at RICHARD E JOHNSON PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

314 W Jefferson St

Tallahassee, FL 32301

TIFFANY ROUSSEAU CRUZ

Attorney at FRIEDMAN ABRAHAMSEN & CRUZ - TALLAHASSEE FL

403 E Park Avenue

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant Attorneys

MIRIAM REBEKKAH COLES

Attorney at HENRY BUCHANAN HUDSON ETC - TALLAHASSEE FL

2508 Barrington Cir

Tallahassee, FL 32308

DAWN MARIE MCMAHON

Attorney at HENRY BUCHANAN HUDSON ETC - TALLAHASSEE FL

2508 Barrington Cir

Tallahassee, FL 32308

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/28/19. **Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 4:19cv168-AW/CAS. (pll) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Unavailability and Request for Telephonic Appearance by JEANNETTE L AUSTIN re 10 Notice of Hearing on Motion,,, (CRUZ, TIFFANY) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD ERROL JOHNSON on behalf of KRISTINA REIS (JOHNSON, RICHARD) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by GARY LEE PRINTY on behalf of AGNES REGINA BLANTON (PRINTY, GARY) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY ROUSSEAU CRUZ on behalf of JEANNETTE L AUSTIN (CRUZ, TIFFANY) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER GRANTING IN PART #7 MOTION TO WITHDRAW. This action is STAYED pending further order of this Court. The Clerk is directed to set an in-person hearing for the lawyers and the Plaintiffs. Each Plaintiff must attend the hearing. Plaintiffs need to decide whether to dismiss their claims, proceed pro se, or retain new counsel. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 05/30/2019. (toy) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JEANNETTE L AUSTIN, AGNES REGINA BLANTON, KRISTINA REIS. (GARRITY, JAMES) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#6

(#6) STATUS REPORT Parties Joint Status Report by FLORIDA LOTTERY. (COLES, MIRIAM) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by FLORIDA LOTTERY. (COLES, MIRIAM) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES GARRITY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (GARRITY, JAMES) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#3

(#3) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/1/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/31 /2019. Discovery due by 8/15/2019. Status Report due by 5/17/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 04/17/2019. (toy) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (COLES, MIRIAM) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE FLORIDA LOTTERY from Second Judicial Circuit, Leon County, Florida, case number 2019-CA-000024. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4460285.), filed by THE FLORIDA LOTTERY. (COLES, MIRIAM) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/28/19. **Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 4:19cv168-AW/CAS. (pll) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • (#14) ORAL ORDER - Inasmuch as each Plaintiff is now represented by counsel, the telephonic hearing of July 11, 2019, is canceled. James Garrity and Marie Mattox are permitted to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiffs. The Clerk shall disconnect the notice of electronic filing for withdrawing counsel. Attorney JAMES GARRITY and MARIE A MATTOX terminated. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 6/28/2019. (vkm) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Unavailability and Request for Telephonic Appearance by JEANNETTE L AUSTIN re 10 Notice of Hearing on Motion,,, (CRUZ, TIFFANY) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD ERROL JOHNSON on behalf of KRISTINA REIS (JOHNSON, RICHARD) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by GARY LEE PRINTY on behalf of AGNES REGINA BLANTON (PRINTY, GARY) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney: Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2019 09:00 AM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. United States Courthouse, 111 North Adams St., Tallahassee, Florida 32301. Each Plaintiff must attend the hearing. NOTE: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodation, such as, a hearing impairment that requires a sign language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact Victoria Milton McGee at 850-521-3510 in the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ Victoria Milton McGeeCourtroom Deputy Clerk (vkm) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by TIFFANY ROUSSEAU CRUZ on behalf of JEANNETTE L AUSTIN (CRUZ, TIFFANY) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER GRANTING IN PART #7 MOTION TO WITHDRAW. This action is STAYED pending further order of this Court. The Clerk is directed to set an in-person hearing for the lawyers and the Plaintiffs. Each Plaintiff must attend the hearing. Plaintiffs need to decide whether to dismiss their claims, proceed pro se, or retain new counsel. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 05/30/2019. (toy) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by JEANNETTE L AUSTIN, AGNES REGINA BLANTON, KRISTINA REIS. (GARRITY, JAMES) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/21/2019. (toy) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STATUS REPORT Parties Joint Status Report by FLORIDA LOTTERY. (COLES, MIRIAM) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint by FLORIDA LOTTERY. (COLES, MIRIAM) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES GARRITY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (GARRITY, JAMES) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 5/1/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/31 /2019. Discovery due by 8/15/2019. Status Report due by 5/17/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 04/17/2019. (toy) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (COLES, MIRIAM) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE FLORIDA LOTTERY from Second Judicial Circuit, Leon County, Florida, case number 2019-CA-000024. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4460285.), filed by THE FLORIDA LOTTERY. (COLES, MIRIAM) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARIE A MATTOX