This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2021 at 10:38:18 (UTC).

Blanks v. Four Seasons Hotels, Ltd. et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Blanks filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Four Seasons Hotels, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Brenda Weksler. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00626

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lance Blanks

Defendants

Four Seasons Hotels, Ltd.

Mandalay Place, LLC doing business as Four Seasons Las Vegas

Mandalay Bay LLC doing business as Four Seasons Hotel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig Murphy

Attorney at Murphy & Murphy Law Offices

8414 W. Farm Road, Ste 180, Box 207

Las Vegas, NV 89131

Defendant Attorneys

Karie N. Wilson

Attorney at Alverson Taylor & Sanders

6605 Grand Montecito Parkway #200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

Bruce Alverson

Attorney at Alverson Taylor & Sanders

6605 Grand Montecito Pkwy., Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

12 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

12 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

12 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#12

10 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

10 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

10 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#3

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #14 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice of certain claims and REMANDING this case to the Eight Judicial District Court, Clark County, NV. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; Order and Docket certified to 8JD - DRS) Modified Judge's signature date on 6/9/2021 (SLD). (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Plaintiff's Claims for Alleged Violation of 42 U.S.C. 2000A and N.R.S. 651.070 With Prejudice and Remand to State Court by Defendant Four Seasons Hotels, Ltd.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Four Seasons Hotels, Ltd.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Counter MOTION to Remand to State Court re #1 Petition for Removal, by Plaintiff Lance Blanks. Responses due by 5/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Murphy, Craig) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #10 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b) by attorney Craig M. Murphy. For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #10 addressing the Counter Motion to Remand using the same PDF image and appropriate document event to be in compliance with LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by filing a separate document for each request or purpose. (no image attached) (SLD) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Lance Blanks. Replies due by 5/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3) (Murphy, Craig) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #6 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 5/12/2021. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/6/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Lance Blanks. (Murphy, Craig) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Four Seasons Hotels, Ltd.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Four Seasons Hotels, Ltd.. Responses due by 5/5/2021. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/5/2021. (Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Four Seasons Hotels, Ltd.. (Wilson, Karie) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/15/2021. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/30/2021. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/15/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Four Seasons Hotels, Ltd. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Mandalay Bay, LLC, Corporate Parent Four Seasons Hotels, Ltd., Corporate Parent Mandalay Place, LLC, Corporate Parent Four Seasons Hotels (U.S.) Inc. for Four Seasons Hotels, Ltd. added. (Wilson, Karie) Modified on 4/15/2021 (SLD). (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Case Number A-20-826108-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0978-6449693) by Four Seasons Hotels, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wilson, Karie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mandalay Bay, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig Murphy