Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2020 at 09:38:35 (UTC).

Blankenship v. Indivior Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 Blankenship filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Indivior Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane M. Virden and Debra M. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00135

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jane M. Virden

Presiding Judge

Debra M. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Salina Blankenship

Defendants

Indivior Inc.

Hikma Labs Inc.

Reckitt Benckister Healthcare (UK) Ltd.

Roxand Laboratories, Inc.

Reckitt Benckister Group plc

Mylan Inc.

Reckitt Benckister Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Indivior Solutions, Inc.

Dr. Robert Corkern, M.D.

Dr. Anderson, M.D.

Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Indivior PLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephanie Smith Woodard

Attorney at WOODARD LAW FIRM, LLC

501 7Th St. North, Ste. 8

Columbus, MS 39701

Defendant Attorneys

Lewis W. Bell

Attorney at WATKINS & EAGER

P. O. Box 650

Jackson, MS 39205-0650

Michael D. Chase

Attorney at MITCHELL, MCNUTT & SAMS

P. O. Box 7120

Tupelo, MS 38802-7120

Mary Margaret Ratliff Gay

Attorney at GAY JONES & KUHN, PLLC

P.O. Box 1697, 2906 North State Street, Suite 106

Jackson, MS 39216

Paul Scott Phillips

Attorney at CAMPBELL DELONG, LLP

P.O. Box 1856, 923 Washington Avenue

Greenville, MS 38702-1856

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Gay, Mary Margaret)

#12

(#12) ORDER STAYING CASE re #10 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/28/20. (bfg)

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Phillips, Paul)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Robert Corkern, MD. (Phillips, Paul)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Scott Phillips on behalf of Robert Corkern, MD (Phillips, Paul)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hikma Labs Inc.. (Chase, Michael)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/15/20. (bfg)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hikma Labs Inc.. (Chase, Michael)

#5

(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Reckitt Benckister Healthcare (UK) Ltd., Indivior Solutions, Inc., Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Hikma Labs Inc., Dr. Robert Corkern, M.D., Dr. Anderson, M.D., and Indivior PLC (jla)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time Answer or Otherwise Respond. Indivior, Inc. answer due 10/8/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/3/20. (bfg) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/3/2020) (irw).

#3

(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time by Indivior Inc.. (Bell, Lewis)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Anderson, MD, Robert Corkern, MD, Hikma Labs Inc., Indivior Inc., Indivior PLC, Indivior Solutions, Inc., Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Reckitt Benckister Healthcare (UK) Ltd. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1835157, filed by Salina Blankenship. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Gay, Mary Margaret)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER STAYING CASE re #10 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/28/20. (bfg)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (Phillips, Paul)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Robert Corkern, MD. (Phillips, Paul)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Scott Phillips on behalf of Robert Corkern, MD (Phillips, Paul)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Hikma Labs, Inc. shall have fifteen (15) additional days to file an answer or other responsive pleading. Hikma Labs Inc. answer due 10/8/2020. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/18/20. (bfg)(no document attached)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hikma Labs Inc.. (Chase, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/15/20. (bfg)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hikma Labs Inc.. (Chase, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Reckitt Benckister Healthcare (UK) Ltd., Indivior Solutions, Inc., Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Hikma Labs Inc., Dr. Robert Corkern, M.D., Dr. Anderson, M.D., and Indivior PLC (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Indivior Inc. answer due 10/8/2020. (jla)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time Answer or Otherwise Respond. Indivior, Inc. answer due 10/8/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/3/20. (bfg) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/3/2020) (irw).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time by Indivior Inc.. (Bell, Lewis)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Anderson, MD, Robert Corkern, MD, Hikma Labs Inc., Indivior Inc., Indivior PLC, Indivior Solutions, Inc., Mylan Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Reckitt Benckister Healthcare (UK) Ltd. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1835157, filed by Salina Blankenship. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HIKMA LABS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Roxane Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Indivior, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ANDERSON, INC., THE is a litigant