This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/14/2023 at 08:49:47 (UTC).

Blanco v. Air Flow Designs, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2022 Blanco filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Air Flow Designs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul G. Byron and Daniel C. Irick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-02108

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Byron

Referral Judge

Daniel C. Irick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Julio Blanco

Defendants

Air Flow Designs, Inc.

Air Flow Designs Heating & Air conditioning of Orlando

Jesse H. Burd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zandro E. Palma

Attorney at The Law Offices of Zandro E. Palma, PA

Suite 1500, 9100 South Dadeland Blvd

Miami, FL 33156

Defendant Attorneys

Scottie McPherson

Attorney at Byrd Campbell, PA

Suite 2-A, 180 Park Avenue North

Winter Park, FL 32789

Tucker H. Byrd

Attorney at Byrd Campbell, PA

Suite 2-A, 180 Park Avenue North

Winter Park, FL 32789

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Proposed Summons

#3

(#3) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/16/2022. (GNB) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/16/2022. (GNB) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (LDJ) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

#6

(#6) RETURN of service executed on 11/21/2022 by Julio Blanco as to Air Flow Designs, Inc.. (Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Julio Blanco. Related case(s): No (Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Julio Blanco. (Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint by Air Flow Designs, Inc.. (Byrd, Tucker) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Air Flow Designs, Inc.. (McPherson, Scottie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Air Flow Designs, Inc.. (McPherson, Scottie) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

#13

(#13) FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER: By 1/3/2023 parties shall serve copies upon each other as stated in the order; By 2/21/2023 parties are to meet and confer; Answer to court interrogatories due by 1/24/2023; Settlement Report due by 3/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 12/15/2022. (TNP) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

#14

(#14) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Air Flow Designs, Inc., Jesse H. Burd with Jury Demand. filed by Julio Blanco. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Julio Blanco.(Palma, Zandro) Modified text on 12/23/2022 (LDJ). (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, by Air Flow Designs, Inc..(McPherson, Scottie) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE to counsel Zandro E. Palma, Scottie McPherson, and Tucker H. Byrd of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LDJ) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss, due to the filing of an Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 1/6/2023. (Irick, Daniel) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, by Air Flow Designs, Inc..(McPherson, Scottie) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Air Flow Designs, Inc., Jesse H. Burd with Jury Demand. filed by Julio Blanco. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Julio Blanco.(Palma, Zandro) Modified text on 12/23/2022 (LDJ). (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER: By 1/3/2023 parties shall serve copies upon each other as stated in the order; By 2/21/2023 parties are to meet and confer; Answer to court interrogatories due by 1/24/2023; Settlement Report due by 3/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 12/15/2022. (TNP) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Air Flow Designs, Inc.. (McPherson, Scottie) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ENDORSED ORDER finding as moot #10 Motion to Dismiss, as a duplicative filing. See Doc. 9. Further, the parties are cautioned that an attempt to confer on the date a motion is filed violates the spirit of Local Rule 3.01(g), which requires conferral in good faith to attempt to resolve a dispute, not a pro forma inquiry once a motion is drafted and ready for filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 12/13/2022. (Irick, Daniel) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Air Flow Designs, Inc.. (McPherson, Scottie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint by Air Flow Designs, Inc.. (Byrd, Tucker) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Julio Blanco. (Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Julio Blanco. Related case(s): No (Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of service executed on 11/21/2022 by Julio Blanco as to Air Flow Designs, Inc.. (Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (LDJ) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/16/2022. (GNB) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/16/2022. (GNB) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:22-cv-2108-PGB-DCI. (SJB) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Air Flow Designs, Inc., Jesse H. Burd with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20199235) filed by Julio Blanco. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Palma, Zandro) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIR FLOW DESIGN INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zandro E. Palma