This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:26:29 (UTC).

Blakney v. Ray

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Blakney filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Ray. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kevin McDonald and Donald C Coggins, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-03398

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kevin McDonald

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Larry Blakney

Darlington, SC 29532

Defendant

Patricia Ray

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 1/2/20. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. The plaintiff's #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 12/11/19. (ctuc, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Patricia Ray, filed by Larry Blakney. Service due by 3/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER The plaintiff's complaint is subject to dismissal as it fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in his pleadings identified above by filing an amended complaint within 14 days of this order, along with any appropriate service documents. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/28/20. (ctuc, ) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

1 #1

Envelope

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #12 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Larry Blakney 3903 Darlington County Detention Center 2349 Rogers Raod Darlington, SC 29532 with blank complaint; blank summons and USM285 forms (kric, ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER The plaintiff's complaint is subject to dismissal as it fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The plaintiff may attempt to correct the defects in his pleadings identified above by filing an amended complaint within 14 days of this order, along with any appropriate service documents. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 1/28/20. (ctuc, ) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • (#9) TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (kric, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Larry Blakney 3903 Darlington County Detention Center 2349 Rogers Raod Darlington, SC 29532 with blank summons (kric, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 1/2/20. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. The plaintiff's #2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 12/11/19. (ctuc, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Larry Blakney. Response to Motion due by 12/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(kric, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Patricia Ray, filed by Larry Blakney. Service due by 3/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kric, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.