This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/11/2021 at 09:23:26 (UTC).

Blajszczak v. Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 Blajszczak filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson Consumer Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Freda L. Wolfson and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-18439

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Blajszczak

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC

& JOHNSON JOHNSON

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THERESA M. WALSH

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

5775 Broadway

Lancaster, NY 14086

Defendant Attorneys

John D. Winter

Attorney at Patterson, Belknap, Webb & Tyler LLP

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Thomas Philip Kurland

Attorney at Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

SCOTT A. JAMES

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A, Summons and Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit B, Index of filings

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

7 #7

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

7 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of & JOHNSON JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#9

(#9) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (km) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (km) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of & JOHNSON JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jal) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 1:21-cv-01050. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER to the District of New Jersey. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 10/8/2021. (KM) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketRemark: Clerk notified Multi-District Litigation Panel of potential tag-along case. (LB) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (LB) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation: The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (LB) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to chambers of online civil opening. (LB) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corporation for Johnson & Johnson.. (Kurland, Thomas) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc... (Kurland, Thomas) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Kurland, Thomas) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Attorney for Plaintiff on September 27, 2021, filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Kurland, Thomas) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of New York, Erie County, case number 807206/2021. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0209-4371632), filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, Index of filings)(Kurland, Thomas) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John D. Winter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Philip Kurland

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCOTT A. JAMES