This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2022 at 07:07:53 (UTC).

BLAHA v. COOK GROUP, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 BLAHA filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against COOK GROUP, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-06704

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEPHEN BLAHA

Defendants

COOK MEDICAL LLC

COOK INCORPORATED

COOK GROUP, INC.

COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED

WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher R. Turner

Attorney at Christopher R. Turner PLLC

801 N. Magnolia Ave. Suite 204

Orlando, FL 32803

John T. Kirtley, III

Attorney at FERRER POIROT & WANSBROUGH

2603 Oak Lawn Avenue, Suite 300, P.O. Box 199109

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

Andrea Roberts Pierson

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kip S.M. McDonald

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP (Indianapolis)

300 North Meridian Street, Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Kirtley, III on behalf of Plaintiff STEPHEN BLAHA. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06704-RLY-TAB (Kirtley, John) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#10

(#10) Submission Short Form Complaint, filed by STEPHEN BLAHA. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06704-RLY-TAB(Kirtley, John) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP, INC., COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00073-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00074-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00075-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00077-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00079-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00081-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00082-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00084-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00085-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00086-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00087-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06703-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06704-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP, INC., COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00073-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00074-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00075-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00077-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00079-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00081-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00082-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00084-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00085-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00086-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00087-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06703-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06704-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#6

(#8) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 1/19/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

7 #1

*Restricted*

7 #7

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Stephen Blaha.(Turner, Christopher) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/12/2022.] (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDERED: The Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is STRICKEN. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before December 10, 2021 to remedy the deficiencies noted, or this case will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 11/29/2021. (CKS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/12/2022.] (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Cook Group, Inc., Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC, William Cook Europe APS. (AEP) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/12/2022.] (Entered: 11/23/2021)

1 #5

Proposed Summons William Cook Europe APS

1 #4

Proposed Summons Cook Medical

1 #3

Proposed Summons Cook Inc

1 #2

Proposed Summons Cook Group

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP, INC., COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00073-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00074-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00075-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00077-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00079-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00081-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00082-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00084-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00085-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00086-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00087-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06703-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06704-RLY-TAB (Pierson, Andrea) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK GROUP INCORPORATED, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP, INC., COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00073-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00074-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00075-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00077-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00079-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00081-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00082-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00084-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00085-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00086-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-00087-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06703-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06704-RLY-TAB (McDonald, Kip) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Kirtley, III on behalf of Plaintiff STEPHEN BLAHA. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06704-RLY-TAB (Kirtley, John) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Submission Short Form Complaint, filed by STEPHEN BLAHA. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06704-RLY-TAB(Kirtley, John) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Docket(#9) Remark - Case Transferred In from Middle District of Florida, Cause No. 3:21-cv-1164 on 1/12/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6704-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Western District of Michigan, Cause No. 1:21-cv-1062 on 1/12/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6705-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from Southern District of Ohio, Cause No. 2:21-cv-5836 on 1/19/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6706-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Case Transferred In from District of Oregon, Cause No. 6:21-cv-1859 on 1/12/2022, assigned SD/IN Cause No. 1:22-cv-6707-RLY-TAB and transferred as Member Action to MDL 2570. Associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06704-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06705-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06706-RLY-TAB, 1:22-cv-06707-RLY-TAB (LBT) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Second Amended Order Establishing Policies and Procedures. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 1/19/2022.(LBT) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 3:21-cv-01164. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CKS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/12/2022.] (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Stephen Blaha.(Turner, Christopher) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/12/2022.] (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDERED: The Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is STRICKEN. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before December 10, 2021 to remedy the deficiencies noted, or this case will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 11/29/2021. (CKS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/12/2022.] (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Cook Group, Inc., Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical, LLC, William Cook Europe APS. (AEP) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/12/2022.] (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Brian J. Davis and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:21-cv-1164-BJD-MCR. (SJB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/12/2022.] (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18955179) filed by Stephen Blaha. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Cook Group, #3 Proposed Summons Cook Inc, #4 Proposed Summons Cook Medical, #5 Proposed Summons William Cook Europe APS)(Turner, Christopher) Modified on 11/30/2021 - STRICKEN, per Court Order, doc. 4. (AEP) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/12/2022.] (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COOK GROUP INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where COOK INCORPORATED is a litigant