This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/06/2021 at 09:04:29 (UTC).

Blackwell v. Fort

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 Blackwell filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Fort. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven D. Grimberg and Alan J. Baverman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04259

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

Referral Judge

Alan J. Baverman

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Martin L. Blackwell

Davisboro, GA 31018

Respondent

Warden Kart Fort

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Clint Christopher Malcolm

Attorney at Department of Law - 03

40 Capitol Square, S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30334

Paula K. Smith

Attorney at Department of Law - 03

40 Capitol Square, Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to send Petitioner an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, stamped with the case number for this action. If Petitioner wishes to proceed with this case, he is ORDERED to either (1) pay the $5.00 filing fee, or (2) complete and submit the application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, within thirty (30) days of the date this Order is entered. The Clerk is DIRECTED to RESUBMIT this action to the undersigned Magistrate Judge upon Petitioner's compliance with this Order or the expiration of the thirty-day time period. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 10/18/2021. (jkb) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER directing Clerk to perfect service of petition and order on respondent by certified mail, with copy to State Attorney General. Respondent is directed to show cause within 60 days of receipt of order why writ should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 11/08/2021. (jkb) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Paula K. Smith on behalf of Kart Fort (Smith, Paula) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Clint Christopher Malcolm on behalf of Kart Fort (Malcolm, Clint) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

#6

(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Warden Kart Fort re #3 Order Directing Clerk to Perfect Service of HC Petition, (Attachments: #1 Order) (dmb) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

6 #1

Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Re-Mailing as to Kart Fort re #3 Order Directing Clerk to Perfect Service of HC Petition. CMRR 70183090000213389154 (dmb) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Warden Kart Fort re #3 Order Directing Clerk to Perfect Service of HC Petition, (Attachments: #1 Order) (dmb) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Clint Christopher Malcolm on behalf of Kart Fort (Malcolm, Clint) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Paula K. Smith on behalf of Kart Fort (Smith, Paula) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Martin L. Blackwell, Kart Fort (CMRR: 70183090000213389024), State Attorney General (CMRR: 70183090000213389017) re #3 Order Directing Clerk to Perfect Service of HC Petition. (jkb) Modified on 11/8/2021 to add CMRR numbers(jkb). (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER directing Clerk to perfect service of petition and order on respondent by certified mail, with copy to State Attorney General. Respondent is directed to show cause within 60 days of receipt of order why writ should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 11/08/2021. (jkb) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid: $ 5, receipt number GAN100133954 (jkb) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Martin L. Blackwell re #2 Order. Forms sent to party: Affidavit to Proceed IFP. (jkb) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to send Petitioner an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, stamped with the case number for this action. If Petitioner wishes to proceed with this case, he is ORDERED to either (1) pay the $5.00 filing fee, or (2) complete and submit the application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, within thirty (30) days of the date this Order is entered. The Clerk is DIRECTED to RESUBMIT this action to the undersigned Magistrate Judge upon Petitioner's compliance with this Order or the expiration of the thirty-day time period. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman on 10/18/2021. (jkb) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Alan J. Baverman. (eop) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Martin L. Blackwell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLINT C MALCOLM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paula K. Smith