This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/03/2022 at 07:07:49 (UTC).

Blackwell et al v. Tennessee Valley Authority et al

Case Summary

On 02/02/2022 Blackwell filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Tennessee Valley Authority. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Benjamin Beaton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00019

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Benjamin Beaton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gary L. Blackwell

Carol A Blackwell

Defendants

Tennessee Valley Authority

Michael L. Mott

Cheryl A Mott

William Vaughn Work, Jr.

Dadra Lee Work

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

E. Frederick Straub, Jr.

Attorney at Whitlow, Roberts, Houston & Straub, PLLC

300 Broadway Street, P.O. Box 995

Paducah, KY 42002-0995

Matthew S. Eddy

Attorney at Whitlow, Roberts, Houston & Straub, PLLC

300 Broadway Street, P.O. Box 995

Paducah, KY 42002-0995

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary L. Blackwell, Carol A Blackwell. Tennessee Valley Authority served on 2/22/2022, answer due 3/15/2022. (Eddy, Matthew) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

5 #1

Exhibit Return Receipt for Service to TVA

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Eddy on behalf of Carol A Blackwell, Gary L. Blackwell (Eddy, Matthew) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#3

(#3) Summonses Issued as to Cheryl A Mott, Michael L. Mott, Tennessee Valley Authority, Dadra Lee Work, William Vaughn Work, Jr.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). Attested copy of the Complaint emailed to counsel. (DeW) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (DeW) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

1 #19

Cover Sheet

1 #18

Summons TENDERED Dadra Work

1 #17

Summons TENDERED William Work

1 #12

Exhibit L - 10-23-20 Order

1 #9

Exhibit I - 18 CFR 1304.2

1 #8

Exhibit H - Work 26a Permit Approval

1 #6

Exhibit F - 7-13-54 Special Warranty Deed

1 #5

Exhibit E - Special Warranty Deed

1 #4

Exhibit D -10-17-63 Deed

1 #3

Exhibit C- 1-7-19 General Warranty Deed

1 #2

Exhibit B- 7-31-96 General Warranty Deed

1 #1

Exhibit A-10-18-11 General Warranty Deed

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary L. Blackwell, Carol A Blackwell. Tennessee Valley Authority served on 2/22/2022, answer due 3/15/2022. (Eddy, Matthew) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service Executed/Unexecuted as to Tennessee Valley Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt for Service to TVA) (Eddy, Matthew) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Eddy on behalf of Carol A Blackwell, Gary L. Blackwell (Eddy, Matthew) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summonses Issued as to Cheryl A Mott, Michael L. Mott, Tennessee Valley Authority, Dadra Lee Work, William Vaughn Work, Jr.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). Attested copy of the Complaint emailed to counsel. (DeW) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (DeW) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND PETITION FOR DECLARATION OF RIGHTS filed by Gary L. Blackwell, Carol A Blackwell against Tennessee Valley Authority, Michael L. Mott, Cheryl A Mott, William Vaughn Work, Jr., Dadra Lee Work. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AKYWDC-3517301.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-10-18-11 General Warranty Deed, #2 Exhibit B- 7-31-96 General Warranty Deed, #3 Exhibit C- 1-7-19 General Warranty Deed, #4 Exhibit D -10-17-63 Deed, #5 Exhibit E - Special Warranty Deed, #6 Exhibit F - 7-13-54 Special Warranty Deed, #7 Exhibit G - Mott 26a Permit Approval, #8 Exhibit H - Work 26a Permit Approval, #9 Exhibit I - 18 CFR 1304.2, #10 Exhibit J - 7-21-20 Order, #11 Exhibit K - 8-14-20 Order, #12 Exhibit L - 10-23-20 Order, #13 Exhibit M - COA Opinion, #14 Summons TENDERED TVA, #15 Summons TENDERED Michael Mott, #16 Summons TENDERED Cheryl Mott, #17 Summons TENDERED William Work, #18 Summons TENDERED Dadra Work, #19 Cover Sheet) (DeW) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tennessee Valley Authority is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer E. Frederick Straub, Jr.