This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/30/2019 at 07:05:40 (UTC).

Blackwell et al v. Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/01/2019 Blackwell filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Peggy Kuo and Pamela K. Chen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05561

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Peggy Kuo

Presiding Judge

Pamela K. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Kaliah Blackwell

S.N.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Luis Hernandez

Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Anthony Mallilo

Attorney at Mallilo & Grossman, Esq.

163-09 Northern Boulevard

Flushing, NY 11358

Jessica Lynn Kronrad

Attorney at Jessica Kronrad, Esq

163-09 Northern Boulevard

Flushing, NY 11358

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Kevin Michael Zimmerman

Attorney at Lewis BrisBois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

77 Water Street

New York, NY 10005

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, this case is remanded to New York State Supreme Court, Kings County, under Index No. 518792/2019, for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction.Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 10/18/2019. (Shi, Yi Qing) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

8 #1

Proposed Discovery Plan

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on November 21, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan) (Riquelme, Claudia) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#7

(#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Luis Hernandez, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. (Zimmerman, Kevin) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#6

(#6) VERIFIED ANSWER to Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by All Defendants. (Zimmerman, Kevin) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lynn Kronrad on behalf of Kaliah Blackwell (aty to be noticed) (Kronrad, Jessica) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Luis Hernandez, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ryder System, Inc. for Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.. (Zimmerman, Kevin) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Removal Action Complaint State Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Luis Hernandez, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. from Supreme Court Kings County, case number 518792/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11901191) (Attachments: #1 Removal Action Complaint State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Zimmerman, Kevin) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • Civil Case Terminated. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, this case is remanded to New York State Supreme Court, Kings County, under Index No. 518792/2019, for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction.Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 10/18/2019. (Shi, Yi Qing) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference will be held in this case on November 21, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. before Peggy Kuo, United States Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 11C South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. All counsel are required to attend. Counsel are directed to the annexed Initial Conference Order for instructions. At least five days before the Conference, the parties must file a completed copy of the Proposed Discovery Plan, a PDF version of which may be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/pub/PK-discovplan.pdf. Any request for adjournment of this or any other conference must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether or not all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least two (2) business days before the scheduled conference, except in the event of an emergency. Counsel with knowledge and authority must be present. Per diem counsel may not appear without prior permission of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 10/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Discovery Plan) (Riquelme, Claudia) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Luis Hernandez, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. (Zimmerman, Kevin) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) VERIFIED ANSWER to Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by All Defendants. (Zimmerman, Kevin) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Lynn Kronrad on behalf of Kaliah Blackwell (aty to be noticed) (Kronrad, Jessica) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Luis Hernandez, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ryder System, Inc. for Ryder Truck Rental, Inc.. (Zimmerman, Kevin) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Luis Hernandez, Ryder Truck Rental, Inc. from Supreme Court Kings County, case number 518792/2019. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ANYEDC-11901191) (Attachments: #1 Removal Action Complaint State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Zimmerman, Kevin) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.N. is a litigant

Latest cases where RYDER TRUCK RENTAL LT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Michael Zimmerman