This case was last updated from PACER on 10/30/2020 at 10:07:43 (UTC).

BLACKMON v. WILLIAMS

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 BLACKMON filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against WILLIAMS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02446

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JAMES BLACKMON

Lisbon, OH 44432

Respondent

WILLIAMS

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/11/2020. (zsb) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/11/2020. (zsb) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JAMES BLACKMON. (zmd) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JAMES BLACKMON. (zmd) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER DISMISSING PRO SE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Ordered that the application of the plaintiff to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. This is a final appealable Order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/11/2020. (zsb) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/11/2020. (zsb) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PARTIAL PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by JAMES BLACKMON. (INMATE INQUIRY) (zmd) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JAMES BLACKMON. (zmd) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JAMES BLACKMON. (zmd) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketInitiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 8/31/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less